Global Patent Index - EP 1767726 B1

EP 1767726 B1 2007-10-31 - Cover opening and closing device

Title (en)

Cover opening and closing device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Öffnen und Schliessen einer Abdeckung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour ouvrir et fermer une couverture

Publication

EP 1767726 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06018714 A

Priority

DE 102005045963 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102005045963B3] The drive for opening and closing a smoke cover has the cover (2) pivoted to a frame section (6). A lifter (22) is connected between the first frame section opposite a second frame section (12). A coupling connects the cover and lifter and a linear actuator is connected between the lifter and the cover. The lifter and coupling have engagement faces which engage on the first frame section when the cover is lifted.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/04 (2006.01); E04D 13/035 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0354 (2013.01); E05F 15/53 (2013.01); E05F 15/622 (2013.01); E05F 15/72 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/154 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005045963 B3 20060928; AT 377118 T 20071115; DE 502006000159 D1 20071213; EP 1767726 A1 20070328; EP 1767726 B1 20071031; RU 2006134110 A 20080410; RU 2333330 C2 20080910

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-11-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-11-30 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080906

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HEINRICH STRUNZ G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-08-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-06-30 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E002898

2008-06-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-05-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-05-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-05-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-05-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080211

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-03-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-01-09 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006000159 P 20071213

2007-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070111

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU