Global Patent Index - EP 1767864 A3

EP 1767864 A3 2017-10-18 - Operating device for domestic cooking device

Title (en)

Operating device for domestic cooking device

Title (de)

Haushaltsgerätbetätigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'actionnement pour un four ménager

Publication

EP 1767864 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06119656 A

Priority

DE 102005042805 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1767864A2] The actuator device for a household appliance has a stationary element (16,18) for arrangement on the appliance and an actuator element (8) to be held by the user. The actuator element can be moved from a rest position to an actuating position relative to the stationary element.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1767864 A2 20070328; EP 1767864 A3 20171018; DE 102005042805 A1 20070315

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180807

2018-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2018-06-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2018-06-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2018-06-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: HR

2018-06-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2018-06-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2018-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20180418

2018-05-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2017-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24C 15/02 20060101AFI20170911BHEP

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU