Global Patent Index - EP 1769007 A4

EP 1769007 A4 2010-02-24 - POLYMERIC COMPOSITIONS AND RELATED METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

POLYMERIC COMPOSITIONS AND RELATED METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS POLYMERES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1769007 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05857520 A

Priority

  • US 2005024642 W
  • US 58674204 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006091226A2] Methods for surface-initiated atom transfer radical polymerization, which can utilize a catecholic alkyl halide initiator.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 2/50 (2013.01); B05D 3/10 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C09D 5/1662 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PYUN J ET AL: "Synthesis of Polymer Brushes Using Atom Transfer Radical Polymerization", MACROMOLECULAR: RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, vol. 24, no. 18, 1 January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 1043 - 1059, XP003013544, ISSN: 1022-1336
  • [A] GU B ET AL: "Synthesis of Aluminium Oxide/Gradient Copolymer Composites by Atom Transfer Radical Polymerization", MACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 35, no. 23, 1 January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 8913 - 8916, XP003013545, ISSN: 0024-9297
  • [A] DALSIN J L ET AL: "Mussel Adhesive Protein Mimetic Polymers for the Preparation of Nonfouling Surfaces", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, USA, vol. 125, no. 14, 1 January 2003 (2003-01-01), pages 4253 - 4258, XP003013546, ISSN: 0002-7863
  • [A] RAJH T ET AL: "Surface Restrcturing of Nanoparticles: An Efficient Route for Ligend-Metal Oxide Grosstalk", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY. B (ONLINE), AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, COLUMBUS, OH, US, vol. 106, no. 41, 1 January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 10543 - 10552, XP003013547, ISSN: 1520-5207

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006091226 A2 20060831; WO 2006091226 A3 20061026; EP 1769007 A2 20070404; EP 1769007 A4 20100224

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1102601

2010-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100422

2010-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MESSERSMITH, PHILLIP, B.

2010-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FAN, XIAOWU

2010-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIN, LIJIN

2010-02-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100125

2007-11-30 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1102601

2007-10-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU