Global Patent Index - EP 1770229 A3

EP 1770229 A3 2009-02-25 - Skylight with smoke flaps

Title (en)

Skylight with smoke flaps

Title (de)

Lichtbandanordnung mit Rauchklappen

Title (fr)

Lanternau avec volets de fumée

Publication

EP 1770229 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06018819 A

Priority

DE 102005046578 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1770229A2] The arrangement has two wings (6, 7) that are curved along a longitudinal axis (2) of a light band, where opening and closing mechanisms are coupled around the wings. The two wings are arranged adjacent to each other and are supported such that the wings are raised and/or lowered in the same direction during operation of the opening and closing mechanisms. The wings are provided with an opening angle that is less than ninety degrees.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/03 (2006.01); F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/02 (2013.01); E04D 13/032 (2013.01); F24F 11/34 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1770229 A2 20070404; EP 1770229 A3 20090225; DE 102005046578 B3 20070322

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100220

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU