Global Patent Index - EP 1772356 A9

EP 1772356 A9 2009-02-11 - Composite body for a golf car and utility vehicle

Title (en)

Composite body for a golf car and utility vehicle

Title (de)

Aufbau aus Verbundwerkstoff für einen Golfwagen oder Nutzfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Carrosserie composite de voiturette de golf ou de véhicule de service

Publication

EP 1772356 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 06022935 A

Priority

  • EP 04704832 A
  • US 44219203 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1772356A1] A vehicle (10), such as a golf car or a utility vehicle, comprises a high-strength molded composite body assembly (58) formed from at least one molded fiber-reinforced polymer panel (61, 63; 64). A plurality of wheels (16a, 16b) support the composite body assembly for movement along the ground. At least one decorative body panel (106, 108) is disposed on the composite body assembly. The at least one decorative body panel is recessed inwardly relative to the periphery of the composite body assembly such that the composite body assembly extends outwardly of the decorative body panel so as to prevent impact with the decorative body panel.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62D 29/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1772356 A1 20070411; EP 1772356 A9 20090211; EP 1772356 B1 20120328; EP 1772356 B8 20120502; EP 1772356 B9 20120718

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130103

2012-07-05 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2384463 T3

- Effective date: 20120705

2012-04-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CLUB CAR, LLC

2012-03-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1592604 P

2012-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB

2012-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-02-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITE BODY FOR A GOLF CAR AND UTILITY VEHICLE

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071217

2007-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BATAILLE, STEVEN ROBERT

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CROW, DOUGLAS T.

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARDY, DAVID R.

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEWIS, GARY L.

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORGAN, PAUL E.

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MULGREW, PETER A.

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NEWMAN, DUANE E.

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SKELTON, GERALD C.

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STEWART, GEOFF D.

2007-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WELSH, MICHAL L.

2007-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061103

2007-04-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1592604 P

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB