Global Patent Index - EP 1772595 A3

EP 1772595 A3 2009-02-25 - Steam turbine exhaust diffuser

Title (en)

Steam turbine exhaust diffuser

Title (de)

Dampfturbinenauslassdiffusor

Title (fr)

Diffuseur de sortie de turbine à vapeur

Publication

EP 1772595 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06255126 A

Priority

US 24397405 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1772595A2] An axial flow steam turbine includes an exhaust diffuser in the form of a volute (40) for diffusing the exhaust steam and turning the exhaust steam from a generally axial flow direction to a generally radial direction. The volute exit (46) may be at the bottom or to one side of the steam turbine. The volute and casing are independently mounted relative to one another on a foundation with a flexible joint therebetween.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/30 (2006.01); F01D 25/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/30 (2013.01); F01D 25/28 (2013.01); F05D 2220/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1772595 A2 20070411; EP 1772595 A3 20090225; CN 1944962 A 20070411; JP 2007100701 A 20070419; US 2007081892 A1 20070412

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-12-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 25/30 20060101AFI20090121BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 25/28 20060101ALI20090121BHEP

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU