Global Patent Index - EP 1775418 A3

EP 1775418 A3 2009-02-25 - Ascending or descending device

Title (en)

Ascending or descending device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Hinauf- und Hinabsteigen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour monter et descendre

Publication

EP 1775418 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06021454 A

Priority

DE 102005049332 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1775418A2] The device has two supports such as cross beams (1), connected with one another by cross rods (2) such as rungs. A detection unit is provided to detect and if necessary to display the proper and/or improper utilization of the climb up and climb down device. The unit is operated and/or can be activated during installation and/or in the constructed state. The unit has a sensor, which is assigned to one of the supports and/or the rods.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1775418 A2 20070418; EP 1775418 A3 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-02-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU