Global Patent Index - EP 1777449 A9

EP 1777449 A9 2007-10-10 - Joint for connecting a branch pipe to a main pipe carrying a fluid

Title (en)

Joint for connecting a branch pipe to a main pipe carrying a fluid

Title (de)

Anschluss zum Verbinden eines Abzweigrohres mit einem fluidführenden Hauptrohr

Title (fr)

Raccord pour raccorder un tuyau de branchement à un tuyau principal transportant un fluide

Publication

EP 1777449 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 06122719 A

Priority

IT BS20050124 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1777449A1] A joint (10) for connecting a utility branch pipe (11) to a fluid carrying main pipe, comprises, into a hollow body (12) having a central portion (13) from which there extend a first end (14) for the connection to the main pipe, a second end (15) for the connection to the branch pipe (11), and a third end (16), opposite and aligned with the first one, for the connection to a pipe punching device, a shutting device (19) turnable between an open position that allows the passage of said pipe punching device through said hollow body and a closed position that intercepts the passage of said fluid from the main pipe.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 41/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1777449 A1 20070425; EP 1777449 A9 20071010; IT BS20050124 A1 20070421

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080311

2008-04-09 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: AL

2008-04-09 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: BA

2008-04-09 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: HR

2008-04-09 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: MK

2008-04-09 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: RS

2008-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: AL

2008-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: BA

2008-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: HR

2008-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: MK

2008-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070730

- Countries: YU

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070730

2007-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU