Global Patent Index - EP 1778032 A4

EP 1778032 A4 2009-02-25 - VENTED PROTECTIVE GARMENT

Title (en)

VENTED PROTECTIVE GARMENT

Title (de)

BELÜFTETES SCHUTZKLEIDUNGSSTÜCK

Title (fr)

VETEMENT DE PROTECTION VENTILE

Publication

EP 1778032 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 04778838 A

Priority

US 2004023513 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006022617A2] A protective garment including a generally continuous outer shell and a moisture barrier located generally inside of the outer shell such that when the garment is worn, the moisture barrier is located generally between the outer shell and a wearer of the garment. The moisture barrier includes at least one vent such that at least part of the air located inside the moisture barrier can be vented outside of the moisture barrier.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/28 (2013.01); A41D 13/00 (2013.01); A41B 2400/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [L] US 2004154084 A1 20040812 - ALDRIDGE DONALD [US], et al
  • [XY] US 2003033656 A1 20030220 - JAEGER KNUT [DE]
  • [Y] US 5845336 A 19981208 - GOLDE PAUL J [US]
  • [Y] DE 8704993 U1 19870625
  • [Y] JP H08284009 A 19961029 - KOMINE AUTO CENTER KK
  • [Y] GB 461247 A 19370209 - SAMUEL GEORGE STRAUSS
  • [T] PETRA KNECHT: "Funktionstextilien", 1 January 2003, DEUTSCHER FACHVERLAG, FRANKFURT AM MAIN, ISBN: 3-87150-833-0, XP002500446
  • [Y] ANONYMOUS: "Jack Wolfskin Doppeljacke Thunder & Lightning > Erfahrungsberichte > Prima Klima mit Jack!", INTERNET ARTICLE, 27 July 2003 (2003-07-27), XP002500445, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://reisen.ciao.de/Jack_Wolfskin_Doppeljacke_Thunder_Lightning__Test_2650947> [retrieved on 20081020]
  • [Y] ANONYMOUS: "CYCLOAK GT PRO JACKET BLACK/GREY", INTERNET ARTICLE, 3 July 2003 (2003-07-03), XP002500444, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://web.archive.org/web/20030703180502/http://casporttouring.com/thestore/prods/cycloakgtjktG.html> [retrieved on 20081020]
  • [Y] ANONYMOUS: "Dealer Workbook Summer 2004", 1 January 2004, MAMMUT SPORTS GROUP, XP002500447
  • See also references of WO 2006022617A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006022617 A2 20060302; WO 2006022617 A3 20070322; WO 2006022617 A8 20071011; AU 2004322482 A1 20060302; AU 2004322482 B2 20100422; CA 2573973 A1 20060302; CA 2573973 C 20130716; EP 1778032 A2 20070502; EP 1778032 A4 20090225; EP 1778032 B1 20111026; HK 1103604 A1 20120720

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20171019 AND 20171025

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-09-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: LION GROUP, INC., US

- Effective date: 20170823

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LION GROUP, INC, DAYTON, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LION APPAREL, INC., DAYTON, OHIO, US

- Document: DE 602004035047

2017-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602004035047

- Representative's name: MARKS & CLERK (LUXEMBOURG) LLP, LU

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120206

2012-11-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602004035047

- Effective date: 20120727

2012-10-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120727

2012-07-20 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1103604

2011-12-22 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602004035047

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-10-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LION GROUP, INC, DAYTON, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LION APPAREL, INC., DAYTON, OHIO, US

- Document: DE 602004035047

2011-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2011-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LION APPAREL, INC.

2009-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090608

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090126

2008-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A41D 13/00 20060101AFI20080128BHEP

2007-12-28 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1103604

2007-12-12 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-10-31 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2007-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070111

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK