Global Patent Index - EP 1779994 A8

EP 1779994 A8 2007-10-10 - METHOD OF PRODUCING THERMOPLASTIC RESIN HOLLOW MOLDED PRODUCT

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING THERMOPLASTIC RESIN HOLLOW MOLDED PRODUCT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOHLEN FORMKÖRPERS AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEM HARZ

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT CREUX MOULÉ EN RÉSINE THERMOPLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1779994 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 05780154 A

Priority

  • JP 2005013723 W
  • JP 2004222134 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1779994A1] A process for producing a hollow blow-molded product with high productivity is provided by improving heating efficiency of a parison without significant changes to a molding machine for producing the product. The invention relates to the following production process. A process for producing a resin hollow molded product, which comprises the step of heating a parison formed of a thermoplastic resin material, and the step of blow-molding the heated parison, the heating step involving a near-infrared heater with a maximum energy wavelength in the range of 900 nm to 1500 nm and a wavelength converter disposed outside the parison, which absorbs the radiation from the near-infrared heater and emits the radiation as an infrared radiation longer than the maximum radiation energy. The wavelength converter emits radiation preferably with a maximum energy wavelength in the range of 3000 nm to 5000 nm.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 49/64 (2006.01); B29K 67/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 49/64 (2013.01); B29B 2911/1402 (2013.01); B29B 2911/14026 (2013.01); B29B 2911/14033 (2013.01); B29B 2911/1404 (2013.01); B29B 2911/14106 (2013.01); B29B 2911/14133 (2013.01); B29C 49/06 (2013.01); B29C 2035/0822 (2013.01); B29K 2067/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1779994 A1 20070502; EP 1779994 A4 20111130; EP 1779994 A8 20071010; EP 1779994 B1 20130605; CN 100515731 C 20090722; CN 1993217 A 20070704; JP 4823902 B2 20111124; JP WO2006011507 A1 20080501; KR 100829467 B1 20080516; KR 20070039137 A 20070411; TW 200611814 A 20060416; TW I259799 B 20060811; US 2007284788 A1 20071213; WO 2006011507 A1 20060202

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-06-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005039905

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140306

2013-08-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005039905

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2013-04-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130402

2011-11-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20111027

2011-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 49/64 20060101AFI20111021BHEP

2011-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29K 67/00 20060101ALI20111021BHEP

2007-11-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-11-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.

2007-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR