Global Patent Index - EP 1780402 B1

EP 1780402 B1 2009-02-25 - Connector, connector-actor unit, injector, and method of assembling the actor to the injector

Title (en)

Connector, connector-actor unit, injector, and method of assembling the actor to the injector

Title (de)

Verbindungsstück, Verbindungsstück-Aktor-Einheit, Einspritzventil und Verfahren zum Zusammenbau des Aktors in das Einspritzventil

Title (fr)

Connecteur, unité connecteur-actionneur, injecteur et procédé de assemblage l'actionneur dans l'injecteur

Publication

EP 1780402 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05023443 A

Priority

EP 05023443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1780402A1] A connector (32) for an injector comprises at least one first U-shaped connector pin (36). The first U-shaped connector pin (36) comprises a first and a second side piece (40,42) which are connected by a middle piece (41). The middle piece (41) is fixed to a connector body (48). The connector body (48) comprises at least one first connector recess (50) next to the first side piece (40) of the first U-shaped connector pin (36).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/005 (2013.01); F02M 61/168 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1780402 A1 20070502; EP 1780402 B1 20090225; DE 602005012966 D1 20090409

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005012966 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2008-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080319

2008-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2007-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071022

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU