Global Patent Index - EP 1781881 B1

EP 1781881 B1 2009-02-11 - MOUNTING PLATE FOR ADJUSTABLY RETAINING FURNITURE HINGES ON THE FRAME OF PIECES OF FURNITURE

Title (en)

MOUNTING PLATE FOR ADJUSTABLY RETAINING FURNITURE HINGES ON THE FRAME OF PIECES OF FURNITURE

Title (de)

MONTAGEPLATTE ZUR VERSTELLBAREN HALTERUNG VON MÖBELSCHARNIEREN AM KORPUS VON MÖBELSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

PLAQUE DE MONTAGE POUR FIXER DE MANIERE MOBILE, DES CHARNIERES DE MEUBLES SUR LE CORPS DE MEUBLES

Publication

EP 1781881 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05770678 A

Priority

  • EP 2005008662 W
  • DE 202004013401 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006024374A1] The invention relates to a multipart mounting plate (10) for furniture hinges which comprises a base (12), fastened to a supporting wall of a piece of furniture, and an elongate top (16) which is adjustably retained in relation to the base (12) and on which the supporting wall stop part of a pertaining hinge can be mounted. A center part (14) is arranged between the base (12) and the top (16) and is retained in such a manner that it can be displaced longitudinally on the base but is secured from being lifted off. The top (16), in the area of the end projecting from the frame and being front in the position of fastening according to the invention, is mounted on the center part (14) so as to be swiveled about an axis which extends on the supporting wall at an angle to the longitudinal extension of the top (16) and in parallel to the fastening plane of the base (12). According to the invention, an adjusting mechanism allows to fix the top (16) in selectable swiveling positions on the center part (14).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0407 (2013.01); E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05D 7/125 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/554 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 202004013401 U1 20060105; AT 422593 T 20090215; CN 101010476 A 20070801; CN 101010476 B 20101208; DE 502005006614 D1 20090326; EP 1781881 A1 20070509; EP 1781881 B1 20090211; US 2008115327 A1 20080522; WO 2006024374 A1 20060309

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150810

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120810

2013-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 422593 T

- Effective date: 20120810

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005006614 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2007-12-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-12-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2007-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT