Global Patent Index - EP 1784752 A4

EP 1784752 A4 2009-02-25 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ENVIRONMENTAL MONITORING

Title (en)

METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ENVIRONMENTAL MONITORING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMGEBUNGSÜBERWACHUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1784752 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05779666 A

Priority

  • US 2005028019 W
  • US 59975904 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006017796A2] An environment monitoring system and application monitor environmental data by operating one or more data collection plug-ins to collect raw data associated with a measurement instrument. The system receives, at a data engine core, the raw data from the data collection plug-in(s) and routes the raw data to a conversion plug-in. The system operates the conversion plug-in to convert the raw data into measurement data and receives the measurement data from the conversion plug-in at the data engine core. The system also receives a view definition that identifies measurement data to be received by a destination plug-in and provides measurement data that matches the view definition to each destination plug-in that registers an interest in the view definition for display to an operator of the system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/00 (2006.01); G05B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01T 7/00 (2013.01); G05B 23/0235 (2013.01); G05B 23/0267 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006017796 A2 20060216; WO 2006017796 A3 20060330; EP 1784752 A2 20070516; EP 1784752 A4 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01T 7/00 20060101AFI20120312BHEP

2012-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05B 23/02 20060101ALI20120312BHEP

2009-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090122

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 19/00 20060101AFI20060823BHEP

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05B 23/02 20060101ALI20090114BHEP

2007-11-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR