Global Patent Index - EP 1786918 A4

EP 1786918 A4 2009-02-11 - NOVEL TETRAVALENT BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY

Title (en)

NOVEL TETRAVALENT BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY

Title (de)

NEUER TETRAVALENTER BISPEZIFISCHER ANTIKÖRPER

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU ANTICORPS BISPECIFIQUE TETRAVALENT

Publication

EP 1786918 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05773142 A

Priority

  • US 2005025472 W
  • US 58868804 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006020258A2] The invention is directed to novel tetravalent antibodies, which are preferably bi-specific. The tetravalent bispecific antibodies can be efficiently expressed in prokaryotic and eukaryotic cells, and are useful in therapeutic and diagnostic methods. The invention further describes administration of the antibodies, either alone or in combination with anti­angiogenic or anti-neoplastic drugs to inhibit tumor growth and/or angiogenesis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/28 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); C07K 16/46 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/2863 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2317/31 (2013.01); C07K 2317/622 (2013.01); C07K 2317/626 (2013.01); C07K 2317/73 (2013.01); C07K 2317/732 (2013.01); C07K 2317/77 (2013.01); C07K 2317/92 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 02100348 A2 20021219 - GENMAB AS [DK], et al
  • [XY] LU D ET AL: "Di-diabody: a novel tetravalent bispecific antibody molecule by design", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 279, no. 1-2, 1 August 2003 (2003-08-01), pages 219 - 232, XP004455322, ISSN: 0022-1759
  • [Y] ZHU Z ET AL: "Inhibition of human leukemia in an animal model with human antibodies directed against vascular endothelial growth factor receptor 2. Correlation between antibody affinity and biological activity.", LEUKEMIA (BASINGSTOKE), vol. 17, no. 3, March 2003 (2003-03-01), pages 604 - 611, XP002508501, ISSN: 0887-6924
  • [Y] WU YAN ET AL: "A fully human monoclonal antibody against VEGFR-1 inhibits growth of human breast cancers.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, vol. 45, March 2004 (2004-03-01), & 95TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ASSOCIATION-FOR-CANCER-RESEARCH; ORLANDO, FL, USA; MARCH 27 -31, 2004, pages 694 - 695, XP001537029, ISSN: 0197-016X
  • [PY] LUNEC A: "Molecular targets and cancer therapeutics. 28 September - 1 October 2004, Geneva, Switzerland", IDRUGS 200411 GB, vol. 7, no. 11, November 2004 (2004-11-01), pages 961 - 964, XP009110186, ISSN: 1369-7056
  • [Y] ANSELMA DEBORAH J ET AL: "Purification of a tetravalent bispecific antibody to EGFR and IGFR.", ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 227, no. Part 1, March 2004 (2004-03-01), & 227TH NATIONAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-CHEMICAL SOCIETY; ANAHEIM, CA, USA; MARCH 28 -APRIL 01, 2004, pages U235, XP009110185, ISSN: 0065-7727

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006020258 A2 20060223; WO 2006020258 A3 20061012; EP 1786918 A2 20070523; EP 1786918 A4 20090211; JP 2008512352 A 20080424

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091006

2009-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMCLONE LLC

2009-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-02-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/28 20060101AFI20090107BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/46 20060101ALI20090107BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 39/395 20060101ALI20090107BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12P 21/08 20060101ALI20090107BHEP

2007-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070219

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU