Global Patent Index - EP 1787536 A4

EP 1787536 A4 2009-02-25 - WOMEN'S GARMENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

WOMEN'S GARMENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

FRAUENKLEIDER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

VETEMENT FEMININ ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1787536 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05739218 A

Priority

  • JP 2005008759 W
  • JP 2004241287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1787536A1] The present invention provides a brassiere capable of reducing sagging muscles and skin wrinkles by being worn, and providing wearing comfort with almost no physical burden on the wearer. The present invention relates to a garment for women including cup portions 1 for holding the breasts, a support portion 2 for fixing the cup portions, elastic underarm band portions 3 for covering the body from the side to the back thereof, and straps 4, and to a method for manufacturing the same. Each underarm band portion 3 has disposed thereto a first member 5 made of a non-elastic fabric for lifting the part of the latissimus dorsi muscle in the underarm area, in such a manner that the first members each press against the part of the latissimus dorsi muscle in the underarm area when the garment is worn. The support portion 2 has disposed thereto second members 6 made of a non-elastic fabric for lifting the part of the pectoralis major muscle in the underarm area, in such a manner that the second members each press against the part of the pectoralis major muscle in the underarm area when the garment is worn.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/12 (2006.01); A41C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1787536 A1 20070523; EP 1787536 A4 20090225; CN 1993063 A 20070704; CN 1993063 B 20100421; HK 1103603 A1 20100910; JP WO2006018919 A1 20080501; KR 100879697 B1 20090121; KR 20070059104 A 20070611; WO 2006018919 A1 20060223

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091229

2009-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090615

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090123

2007-11-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR