Global Patent Index - EP 1788101 B8

EP 1788101 B8 2009-02-18 - ALUMINIUM-BASED ALLOY AND A PRODUCT MADE THEREOF

Title (en)

ALUMINIUM-BASED ALLOY AND A PRODUCT MADE THEREOF

Title (de)

ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTES PRODUKT

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE A BASE D'ALUMINIUM ET ARTICLE FABRIQUE A PARTIR DE CET ALLIAGE

Publication

EP 1788101 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 04817667 A

Priority

RU 2004000322 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1788101A1] The present invention relates to aluminium-based alloy of Al-Cu-Mg-Li type and to an article made thereof which are intended to be used in aircraft and aerospace vehicles. While having high strength properties (ultimate strength level and yield strength level) the suggested alloy has a reduced sound conductivity upon acoustic influence. The invented alloy contains (mass. %): Sheets of said alloy are particularly suited to be used as structural material for aircraft and aerospace vehicles in the form of skin and a primary sheets' set.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/12 (2013.01); C22C 21/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1788101 A1 20070523; EP 1788101 A4 20071121; EP 1788101 B1 20081112; EP 1788101 B8 20090218; CA 2579224 A1 20060413; CA 2579224 C 20100406; DE 602004017787 D1 20081224; US 2008292491 A1 20081127; US 7628953 B2 20091208; WO 2006038827 A1 20060413; WO 2006038827 A8 20060518

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004017787

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140903

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004017787 P 20081224

2008-12-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FEDERALNOE GOSUDARSTVENNOE UNITARNOE PREDPRIYATIE

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-12-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-12-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-11-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071022

2007-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070202

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR