Global Patent Index - EP 1789363 B1

EP 1789363 B1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A CARBON SICCATIVE FOR PRODUCING ELECTRODES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREPARING A CARBON SICCATIVE FOR PRODUCING ELECTRODES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBEREITEN VON KOHLE-TROCKENSTOFF FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ELEKTRODEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SICCATIF AU CARBONE POUR PRODUIRE DES ELECTRODES

Publication

EP 1789363 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04764756 A

Priority

EP 2004009798 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006024315A1] The invention relates to a method for preparing a carbon siccative for producing electrodes. The dust fraction is continuously produced by means of a grinder/sifter combination with a particle size or specific surface that can be adjusted during the operation, preferably by means of a roller grinding mill comprising an integrated sifter.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 31/00 (2006.01); B02C 13/14 (2006.01); B02C 23/32 (2006.01); B07B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/00 (2013.01); B07B 7/083 (2013.01); B07B 11/04 (2013.01); B02C 2015/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006024315 A1 20060309; CN 100548876 C 20091014; CN 101010258 A 20070801; DE 502004008991 D1 20090326; EP 1789363 A1 20070530; EP 1789363 B1 20090211; JP 2008511525 A 20080417; JP 4857271 B2 20120118; US 2007284463 A1 20071213; US 8052077 B2 20111108

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-30 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 502004008991

- Effective date: 20141030

2014-09-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20140625

2014-09-24 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20140625

2014-07-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG

- Effective date: 20091110

2014-06-25 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502004008991

2014-06-25 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 502004008991

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-07-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP RESOURCE TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20091110

2012-11-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CLAUDIUS PETERS PROJECTS GMBH

2012-08-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: LOESCHE GMBH

- Effective date: 20091111

2012-08-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP POLYSIUS AG

- Effective date: 20091110

2012-04-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CLAUDIUS PETERS PROJECTS GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120309

2012-03-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120209 AND 20120215

2012-03-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CLAUDIUS PETERS PROJECTS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CLAUDIUS PETERS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, 21614 BUXTEHUDE, DE

- Document: DE 502004008991

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-03-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004008991

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

- Effective date: 20120109

2012-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004008991

- Representative's name: GLAWE, DELFS, MOLL, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2009-12-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: POLYSIUS AG

- Effective date: 20091110

2009-12-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LOESCHE GMBH

- Effective date: 20091111

2009-12-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: POLYSIUS AG

- Effective date: 20091110

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004008991 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT