Global Patent Index - EP 1791228 B1

EP 1791228 B1 2009-02-25 - Sealed lamp holder

Title (en)

Sealed lamp holder

Title (de)

Abgedichtete Lampenfassung

Title (fr)

Douille de lampe étanche

Publication

EP 1791228 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06018921 A

Priority

DE 102005056022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1791228A2] A lamp socket (1) comprises a socket housing (2) including a stationary first housing part (12) and a second housing part (13) that may be screwed together with the first housing part; a connecting device (5) is accommodated in an inner space enclosed by the housing parts; and flexible sealing sleeve (20) having axial sealing face that associated with sealing face of the socket housing and radial sealing face that is associated with the lamp. The sealing sleeve is made of elastomeric, preferably silicone rubber.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/08 (2006.01); H01R 33/965 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/9658 (2013.01); H01R 33/0881 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1791228 A2 20070530; EP 1791228 A3 20070808; EP 1791228 B1 20090225; CA 2559985 A1 20070524; CN 1972032 A 20070530; CN 1972032 B 20101103; DE 102005056022 A1 20070606; DE 502006002934 D1 20090409; ES 2320583 T3 20090525; US 2007117466 A1 20070524; US 7338302 B2 20080304

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140910

2015-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151026

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140909

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140909

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110910

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-06-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-05-25 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2320583 T3

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002934 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070924

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 33/08 20060101AFI20070629BHEP

2007-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 33/965 20060101ALI20070629BHEP

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU