Global Patent Index - EP 1793081 A3

EP 1793081 A3 2007-10-24 - Rotor thrust balancing apparatus and method

Title (en)

Rotor thrust balancing apparatus and method

Title (de)

Rotorschubausgleichsvorrichtung und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Appareil d' équilibrage de la poussée axiale d'un rotor et méthode

Publication

EP 1793081 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06125145 A

Priority

US 29011405 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1793081A2] Apparatus and method of balancing thrust bearing load on a rotor thrust bearing (40) employ a first thrust balance piston cavity for exerting an aft directed thrust balancing force and a second balance piston cavity (42) for exerting an independently controlled forward directed thrust balancing force to allow flexible and wide range balancing of thrust load on the rotor thrust bearing (40).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 3/04 (2013.01); F05D 2240/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1793081 A2 20070606; EP 1793081 A3 20071024; EP 1793081 B1 20100414; CA 2569933 A1 20070530; DE 602006013579 D1 20100527; JP 2007154888 A 20070621; JP 4854484 B2 20120118; US 2007122265 A1 20070531

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602006013579

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110117

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006013579 P 20100527

2010-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080424

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU