Global Patent Index - EP 1793089 A3

EP 1793089 A3 2007-10-24 - Method and apparatus for reducing axial compressor blade tip flow

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for reducing axial compressor blade tip flow

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reduzieren der Randströmung einer Axialverdichterschaufel

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour réduire les fuites d' extrémité d' aubes de compresseur axial

Publication

EP 1793089 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06125091 A

Priority

US 16463605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1793089A2] A turbine machine (T1) of the type having a high pressure compressor positioned in a casing is provided with a plurality of rotating compressor blades (10-14) with at least one air channel (10C-14C) formed in the blades (10-14) for air flow communication from the base to the tip for extracting and pressurizing air from an inner area proximate the disk (20) and conveying the extracted and pressurized air into an area between the blade tip and casing (C1) for blocking air flow across the tips of the blades (10-14).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/04 (2006.01); F01D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/10 (2013.01); F04D 29/164 (2013.01); F04D 29/684 (2013.01); F05D 2240/307 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1793089 A2 20070606; EP 1793089 A3 20071024; CA 2569177 A1 20070530; CN 101008402 A 20070801; JP 2007154887 A 20070621; US 2007122280 A1 20070531

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100607

2008-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2008-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

2008-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080424

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU