Global Patent Index - EP 1793165 A3

EP 1793165 A3 2009-02-25 - Liquid fuel nozzle, gas turbine combustor, and method of rebuilding gas turbine combustor

Title (en)

Liquid fuel nozzle, gas turbine combustor, and method of rebuilding gas turbine combustor

Title (de)

Flüssigbrennstoffeinspritzdüse, Gasturbinenbrennkammer, und Verfahren zum Umbauen eine Gasturbinenbrennkammer

Title (fr)

Injecteur de carburant liquide, chambre de combustion de turbine à gaz, et méthode pour reconfigurer une chambre de combustion de turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 1793165 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06024947 A

Priority

JP 2005348619 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1793165A2] In a liquid fuel nozzle, a main injection hole 109 for jetting main fuel 33 is of a structure having a straight portion which is in the form of an annular flow path extending parallel to an axis of the liquid fuel nozzle 9, the annular flow path having a flow path cross section not changed along the straight portion. Since the flow rate of fuel jetted out of each liquid fuel nozzle 9 is held even, a deviation of the fuel flow rate can be suppressed without degrading atomization performance of each liquid fuel nozzle mounted in each combustor, and a liquid fuel nozzle with high reliability can be obtained.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/38 (2006.01); F23D 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/383 (2013.01); F23D 11/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1793165 A2 20070606; EP 1793165 A3 20090225; EP 2385299 A2 20111109; EP 2385299 A3 20121128; JP 2007155170 A 20070621

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150701

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090309

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23D 11/38 20060101AFI20070226BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23D 11/24 20060101ALI20090122BHEP

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU