Global Patent Index - EP 1796060 B1

EP 1796060 B1 2010-02-10 - Device and process for automated construction of aircraft emergency trajectory

Title (en)

Device and process for automated construction of aircraft emergency trajectory

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur automatischen Erstellung einer Notfallflugbahn für Luftschiffe

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de construction automatisée de trajectoire d'urgence pour aéronefs

Publication

EP 1796060 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 06125434 A

Priority

FR 0512423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1796060A1] A module prepares a flight plan and flight path of an aircraft. A storage unit stores several procedures to-be used during predefined emergency situations. A computer processor element modifies the flight plan and flight path according to the stored procedures applicable to present emergency situation and optimal for a selected preference function of navigation criteria. An independent claim is also included for an aircraft navigation aid method.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 5/0056 (2013.01); G08G 5/0039 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1796060 A1 20070613; EP 1796060 B1 20100210; CA 2569947 A1 20070607; DE 602006012157 D1 20100325; FR 2894368 A1 20070608; FR 2894368 B1 20080125; US 2007129855 A1 20070607; US 8521340 B2 20130827

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-11-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111205

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101111

2010-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006012157 P 20100325

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2010-02-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-04-30 [R17C] DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071221

2007-12-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071114

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU