Global Patent Index - EP 1797856 A3

EP 1797856 A3 2007-10-17 - Heater for sauna

Title (en)

Heater for sauna

Title (de)

Saunaheizgerät

Title (fr)

Chauffage pour sauna

Publication

EP 1797856 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06023349 A

Priority

DE 202005019488 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1797856A2] In a sauna heating apparatus having a housing (10) with a first chamber (2) for receiving a heater and a second chamber (6) for incorporating an auxiliary device, the second chamber is suitable for receiving different auxiliary devices.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/063 (2013.01); A61H 2201/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202005019488 U1 20070419; EP 1797856 A2 20070620; EP 1797856 A3 20071017

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100707

2009-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EINHELL GERMANY AG

2008-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080417

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU