Global Patent Index - EP 1800584 A3

EP 1800584 A3 2007-10-03 - Combined structure

Title (en)

Combined structure

Title (de)

Kombinierte Struktur

Title (fr)

Structure combinée

Publication

EP 1800584 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 06015434 A

Priority

IT RN20050016 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1800584A2] A combined structure characteristically comprises at least two pieces of sanitary ware (10) connected to one another in a single body. Said connection may be either removable or irremovable.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 4/00 (2006.01); E03C 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 4/00 (2013.01); E03C 1/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1800584 A2 20070627; EP 1800584 A3 20071003; IT RN20050016 U1 20070623

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080404

2008-07-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU