EP 1800755 A1 20070627 - Cyclone separator with an inlet container and separating method using this separator2
Title (en)
Cyclone separator with an inlet container and separating method using this separator2
Title (de)
Zyklonabscheider mit einem Einlasskontainer und Trennverfahren einer Mischung mit solch einem Zyklonabscheider
Title (fr)
Séparateur cyclonique avec un container d'admission et méthode de séparation d'un mélange utilisant un tel séparateur
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 05257883 A 20051220
Abstract (en)
The present invention aims to provide a method of introducing into a cyclone body fluid containing new to be treated materials, a cyclone system, and a dust removal device and an incinerator comprising the system, and an exhaust gas treatment method that are simple and have high physical strength, and yet can improve treatment efficiency. A method of introducing into a cyclone body fluid containing to be treated materials in a cyclone comprising the cyclone body for swirling fluid, a fluid inlet for introducing the fluid, and an outlet duct for evacuating the fluid, characterized in that by not only enclosing at least a part or all of said cyclone body with an introduction container but also exposing said fluid inlet in the said introduction container, and by introducing the fluid containing the to be treated material into said introduction container, the method introduces into the cyclone body the fluid introduced into the said introduction container without continuous piping.
IPC 8 full level
B04C 5/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B04C 5/04 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] US 6958107 B1 20051025 - CLARKE NEVILLE [AU], et al
- [XY] US 2005242007 A1 20051103 - SIMPSON PETER [CA]
- [XY] US 3720314 A 19730313 - PHILLIPPI H
- [X] US 3865242 A 19750211 - MUSTO RICHARD LEOPOLD
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 09 4 September 2002 (2002-09-04)
- [YD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 01 29 January 1999 (1999-01-29)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 263 (C - 196) 24 November 1983 (1983-11-24)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK YU
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05257883 A 20051220