Global Patent Index - EP 1801188 B1

EP 1801188 B1 2009-02-18 - Fuel oils with improved lubricity, comprising mixtures of fatty acids and paraffin dispersing agents and an improved lubricity additive

Title (en)

Fuel oils with improved lubricity, comprising mixtures of fatty acids and paraffin dispersing agents and an improved lubricity additive

Title (de)

Brennstofföle mit verbesserter Schmierwirkung, enthaltend Mischungen aus Fettsäuren mit Paraffindispergatoren, sowie ein schmierverbesserndes Additiv

Title (fr)

Carburants ayant un pouvoir lubrifiant amélioré, comprenant des mélanges d'acides gras avec dispersants de paraffine, tout comme un additif améliorant le pouvoir lubrifiant

Publication

EP 1801188 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 07005871 A

Priority

  • EP 01126254 A
  • DE 10058359 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1209215A2] Cold-stabilized fatty acid composition comprises: (a) 1-99 wt.% saturated mono- or di-carboxylic acids with 6-50 (C) carbon atoms; (b) 1-99 wt.% unsaturated mono- or di-carboxylic acids with 6-50 C atoms; and (c) 0.01-90 wt.% of a polar nitrogen-containing compound that is effective as a wax dispersant in middle distillates. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) A solution comprising the fatty acid composition and 1-80 wt.% organic solvent. (2) Fuel oils comprising a middle distillate with a sulfur content of up to 0.05 wt.% and either the fatty acid composition or solution (1).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/188 (2006.01); C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/222 (2006.01); C10L 1/224 (2006.01); C10L 1/238 (2006.01); C10L 10/04 (2006.01); C10L 10/08 (2006.01); C10L 10/14 (2006.01); C10L 10/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/143 (2013.01); C10L 1/14 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01); C10L 10/08 (2013.01); C10L 10/14 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1824 (2013.01); C10L 1/1852 (2013.01); C10L 1/1855 (2013.01); C10L 1/1881 (2013.01); C10L 1/1883 (2013.01); C10L 1/1885 (2013.01); C10L 1/1888 (2013.01); C10L 1/19 (2013.01); C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 1/1966 (2013.01); C10L 1/1981 (2013.01); C10L 1/221 (2013.01); C10L 1/2222 (2013.01); C10L 1/2225 (2013.01); C10L 1/224 (2013.01); C10L 1/2364 (2013.01); C10L 1/238 (2013.01); C10L 1/2383 (2013.01); C10L 1/2387 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FI FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1209215 A2 20020529; EP 1209215 A3 20030813; EP 1209215 B1 20071010; CA 2363700 A1 20020524; CA 2363700 C 20100406; DE 10058359 A1 20020606; DE 10058359 B4 20051222; DE 50113115 D1 20071122; DE 50114718 D1 20090402; DE 50114719 D1 20090402; EP 1801188 A2 20070627; EP 1801188 A3 20071003; EP 1801188 B1 20090218; EP 1803791 A2 20070704; EP 1803791 A3 20071003; EP 1803791 B1 20090218; ES 2295098 T3 20080416; JP 2002167586 A 20020611; JP 5317380 B2 20131016; US 2002095857 A1 20020725; US 2004083644 A1 20040506; US 6610111 B2 20030826; US RE40758 E 20090623

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161107

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-07-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-07-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114718

2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151015

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151020

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151104

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114718 P 20090402

2009-03-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1209215 P

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB NL SE

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-11-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB NL SE

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/188 20060101AFI20080728BHEP

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/224 20060101ALI20080728BHEP

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/238 20060101ALI20080728BHEP

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 10/14 20060101ALI20080728BHEP

2008-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 10/08 20060101ALI20080728BHEP

2008-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080513

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080403

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/188 20060101AFI20070824BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/224 20060101ALI20070824BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 10/14 20060101ALI20070824BHEP

2007-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 10/08 20060101ALI20070824BHEP

2007-10-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FUEL OILS WITH IMPROVED LUBRICITY, COMPRISING MIXTURES OF FATTY ACIDS AND PARAFFIN DISPERSING AGENTS AND AN IMPROVED LUBRICITY ADDITIVE

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-06-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1209215 P

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR