EP 1801768 A1 20070627 - SAS Addressing of surface discharge AC plasma display
Title (en)
SAS Addressing of surface discharge AC plasma display
Title (de)
SAS-Adressierung einer AC-Plasmaanzeige mit Oberflächenentladung
Title (fr)
Adressage et support simultanés (SAS) d'un affichage à plasma à courant alternatif de décharge de surface
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 05257981 A 20051222
Abstract (en)
There is disclosed the Simultaneous Addressing and Sustaining (SAS) of a surface discharge AC plasma display panel having a row scan, bulk sustain, and column data electrodes wherein at least one section of the panel is addressed while at least one other section of the panel is being simultaneously sustained. The SAS is used with techniques to reduce false contour including motion and visual artifacts. Such techniques include methods and electronic circuitry. In one embodiment, the row scan and bulk sustain electrodes of the section that is being sustained have a reference voltage which is offset from the voltages applied to the column data electrodes for the simultaneous addressing of another section such that the column data electrodes do not electrically interact with the row scan and bulk sustain electrodes.
IPC 8 full level
G09G 3/28 (2006.01); G09G 3/288 (2006.01); G09G 3/292 (2013.01); G09G 3/294 (2013.01); G09G 3/293 (2013.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G09G 3/2022 (2013.01); G09G 3/2927 (2013.01); G09G 3/2948 (2013.01); G09G 3/293 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0218 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0238 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0266 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- US 3499167 A 19700303 - BAKER THEODORE C, et al
- US 3559190 A 19710126 - BITZER DONALD L, et al
- US 5793158 A 19980811 - WEDDING SR DONALD K [US]
- US 5661500 A 19970826 - SHINODA TSUTAE [JP], et al
- US 5674553 A 19971007 - SHINODA TSUTAE [JP], et al
- US 5745086 A 19980428 - WEBER LARRY F [US]
- US 5736815 A 19980407 - AMEMIYA KIMIO [JP]
- US 5828356 A 19981027 - STOLLER RAY A [US]
- US 5541618 A 19960730 - SHINODA TSUTAE [JP]
- US 5724054 A 19980303 - SHINODA TSUTAE [JP]
- US 5446344 A 19950829 - KANAZAWA YOSHIKAZU [JP]
- US 3801861 A 19740402 - PETTY W, et al
- US 3803449 A 19740409 - SCHMERSAL LARRY J [US]
- US 6208081 B1 20010327 - EO YOON-PHIL [KR], et al
- US 6198476 B1 20010306 - HONG JIN-WON [KR], et al
- US 5914563 A 19990622 - LEE EUN-CHEOL [KR], et al
- US 4063131 A 19771213 - MILLER JOHN W V
- US 4087805 A 19780502 - MILLER JOHN W V
- US 4087807 A 19780502 - MIAVECZ JOSEPH L
- US 4611203 A 19860909 - CRISCIMAGNA TONY N [US], et al
- US 4683470 A 19870728 - CRISCIMAGNA TONY N [US], et al
- WO 0030065 A1 20000525 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al
- US 6738033 B1 20040518 - HIBINO JUNICHI [JP], et al
- US 6900598 B2 20050531 - HIBINO JUNICHI [JP], et al
- US 4233623 A 19801111 - PAVLISCAK THOMAS J
- US 4320418 A 19820316 - PAVLISCAK THOMAS J
- EP 1020838 A1 20000719 - PIONEER CORP [JP]
- EP 1022714 A2 20000726 - PIONEER CORP [JP]
- US 6897836 B2 20050524 - TOKUNAGA TSUTOMU [JP]
- US 6495968 B2 20021217 - TOKUNAGA TSUTOMU [JP]
- US 6025818 A 20000215 - OKANO TAKASHI [JP]
- US 6018329 A 20000125 - KIDA HIROSHI [JP], et al
- US 6008793 A 19991228 - SHIGETA TETSUYA [JP]
- US 2005265628 A1 20051201 - TAKAHASHI YASUNORI [JP]
- US 2005156951 A1 20050721 - OKUZAWA MASAHIKO [JP]
- US 2003146910 A1 20030807 - TOKUNAGA TSUTOMU [JP]
- US 2003006944 A1 20030109 - IWAMI TAKASHI [JP], et al
- US 6476875 B2 20021105 - CORREA CARLOS [DE], et al
- US 6473464 B1 20021029 - WEITBRUCH SEBASTIEN [DE], et al
- US 2005253972 A1 20051117 - WWITBRUCH SEBASTIEN [DE], et al
- EP 1522964 A1 20050413 - THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]
- EP 1256924 A1 20021113 - THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]
- US 6661470 B1 20031209 - KAWAKAMI HIDEHIKO [JP], et al
- US 6661469 B1 20031209 - KAWABATA MINORU [JP], et al
- US 6097368 A 20000801 - ZHU DANIEL QIANG [US], et al
- US 2005225512 A1 20051013 - YAMADA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al
- EP 1072153 A1 20010131 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
- US 6097358 A 20000801 - HIRAKAWA HITOSHI [JP], et al
- US 3603836 A 19710907 - GRIER JOHN D
- US 6034657 A 20000307 - TOKUNAGA TSUTOMU [JP], et al
- J. RYEOM: "High-Luminance and High-Contrest HDTV PDP with Overlapping Driving Scheme", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH INTERNATIONAL DISPLAY WORKSHOPS, IDW 99, 1 December 1999 (1999-12-01), pages 743 - 746
- TOKUNAGA: "Development of New Driving Method for AC-PDPs", PIONEER PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH INTERNATIONAL DISPLAY WORKSHOPS, IDW 99, 1 December 1999 (1999-12-01), pages 787 - 790
- KANAZAWA, DIGEST OF THE SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, 1999, pages 154 - 157
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 6337674 B1 20020108 - KIM KYU-TAE [KR]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 26 1 July 2002 (2002-07-01)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 05 31 May 1999 (1999-05-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)
- [X] MAEDA T ET AL: "11.3: A Delta-Nabla Structure PDP with Reduced Number of Data Electrodes and its 51-Contiguous-Subfield Drive", SID, vol. XXXIV, 2003, pages 144 - 147, XP007008217
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK YU
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1801768 A1 20070627; EP 1801768 B1 20101117; AT E488835 T1 20101215; DE 602005024849 D1 20101230
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 05257981 A 20051222; AT 05257981 T 20051222; DE 602005024849 T 20051222