Global Patent Index - EP 1803930 B1

EP 1803930 B1 2009-02-11 - Module with weld suited for high pressure

Title (en)

Module with weld suited for high pressure

Title (de)

Modul mit hochdruckgeeigneter Schweißnahtgestaltung

Title (fr)

Module avec soudure convenant à haute pression

Publication

EP 1803930 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06123335 A

Priority

DE 102005063018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1803930A1] A module comprises a foot part (3) and a head part welded or pressed with a housing (4). Preferred Features: The head part and the foot part each have a peripheral collar (9). The housing is welded to the collar of the head part or foot part. The inner chamber (10) of the module is sealed using welding seams (6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); B23K 26/28 (2006.01); F16J 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01); F02M 2200/8084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1803930 A1 20070704; EP 1803930 B1 20090211; DE 102005063018 A1 20070705; DE 502006002806 D1 20090326

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002806 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080104

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU