Global Patent Index - EP 1805370 B1

EP 1805370 B1 2009-02-11 - SUPPORT FOR THE SUSPENSION OF A ROLLER BROOM ON A SWEEPING VEHICLE

Title (en)

SUPPORT FOR THE SUSPENSION OF A ROLLER BROOM ON A SWEEPING VEHICLE

Title (de)

TRAGVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE AUFHÄNGUNG EINES WALZENBESENS AN EINEM KEHRFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT POUR SUSPENDRE UN BALAI A CYLINDRES SUR UN VEHICULE DE BALAYAGE

Publication

EP 1805370 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05800668 A

Priority

  • EP 2005011523 W
  • DE 102004052760 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006048181A1] The invention relates to a support (1) for the suspension of a roller broom (2) on a sweeping vehicle. Said support comprises a rotational support (3), mounted on the sweeping vehicle so as to be swiveled about a vertical swivel axis (7), a support element (5) suspended on the rotational support (3) via a lifting device (4) comprising a lift drive (26), and a broom frame (6). Said broom frame is received on the support element so as to oscillate about a horizontal axis (16) that extends at an angle to the rotational axis (L) of the roller broom. A movably received detent (17) is mounted in the area of the self-aligning bearing (14) of the broom frame and can assume a first position, in which the oscillating movement of the broom frame is enabled, and a second position, in which the oscillating movement of the broom frame is blocked in the leveled position thereof. The lift drive of the lifting device acts upon said detent in such a manner that the detent assumes its second position when the lift drive is activated.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/05 (2006.01); E01H 5/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/092 (2013.01); E01H 1/056 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 102004052760 A1 20060504; CA 2578783 A1 20060511; DE 502005006623 D1 20090326; EP 1805370 A1 20070711; EP 1805370 B1 20090211; NO 20072592 A 20070522; NO 338205 B1 20160808; RU 2007106035 A 20081010; RU 2376414 C2 20091220; US 2008109982 A1 20080515; WO 2006048181 A1 20060511

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121027

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121028

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111020

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005006623 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI LI SE

2008-02-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-12-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI LI SE

2007-09-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SANDBERG, LARS

2007-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070123

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI LI SE