Global Patent Index - EP 1805378 A4

EP 1805378 A4 2013-09-11 - CONCRETE STRUCTURE SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-CASTING CONCRETE STRUCTURES

Title (en)

CONCRETE STRUCTURE SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-CASTING CONCRETE STRUCTURES

Title (de)

BETONSTRUKTURSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORFORMUNG VON BETONSTRUKTUREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME A STRUCTURES DE BETON ET DISPOSITIF DE PRECOULAGE DE STRUCTURES DE BETON

Publication

EP 1805378 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05825001 A

Priority

  • US 2005039009 W
  • US 62285504 P
  • US 23228905 A
  • US 23144005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006047754A2] An apparatus for producing one or more pre-cast concrete structures. The apparatus may include partitions that may be positioned in a side by side arrangement. The partitions may be moveable with respect to each other to facilitate installation of reinforcing material and removal of the concrete structures from the apparatus after the concrete has hardened. Cavities may be defined by the partitions for receiving concrete to form structures having panels with integral columns. The columns may include slots for receiving an adjacent panel such that adjacent concrete structures may be joined together to form a continuous wall. The partitions may also include interchangeable liners such that different textures or finishes may be applied to the concrete structures.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/0044 (2013.01); B28B 7/0041 (2013.01); B28B 7/007 (2013.01); B28B 7/0079 (2013.01); B28B 7/243 (2013.01); B28B 7/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006047754 A2 20060504; WO 2006047754 A3 20090416; WO 2006047754 A9 20060928; AU 2005299567 A1 20060504; AU 2005299567 B2 20110310; AU 2005299567 B9 20110714; CA 2588112 A1 20060504; CA 2588112 C 20130305; CR 9152 A 20080612; EP 1805378 A2 20070711; EP 1805378 A4 20130911; MX 2007006196 A 20070807

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-05-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1107131

2013-09-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130809

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 2/00 20060101AFI20130805BHEP

2013-08-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 2/00 20060101AFI20130703BHEP

2009-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC

2009-05-20 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090416

2008-03-28 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1107131

2008-01-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070511

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU