Global Patent Index - EP 1806443 B1

EP 1806443 B1 2009-02-11 - Feeding gripper for a shuttleless weaving loom

Title (en)

Feeding gripper for a shuttleless weaving loom

Title (de)

Bringergreifer für eine Greiferwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Pince d'amenée pour métier à tisser à pince

Publication

EP 1806443 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06126596 A

Priority

  • EP 06126596 A
  • EP 06405003 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1806443A1] The feeding gripper (1) has a thread clamp (4) for clamping a weft thread, and an auxiliary guiding and/or holding device (10) for guiding and/or holding the weft thread by a feeding and/or guiding element (5) and has a mass (6). The guiding and/ or holding elements are guided and/or moved by the inertia force of the mass by the acceleration or deceleration of the feeding gripper. An independent claim is also included for a method for guiding and holding a weft thread in feeding gripper.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/20 (2006.01); D03D 47/23 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1806443 A1 20070711; EP 1806443 B1 20090211; CN 1995516 A 20070711; DE 502006002809 D1 20090326; JP 2007182670 A 20070719; US 2007157989 A1 20070712

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091231

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006002809

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SULTEX A.G.

- Effective date: 20101231

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 4

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 4

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002809 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2008-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2008-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071214

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU