Global Patent Index - EP 1806983 B8

EP 1806983 B8 2009-02-18 - NUTRITIONAL AND/OR PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION FOR USE IN PROPHYLAXIS AND TREATMENT OF DISTURBANCES IN MICROELEMENTS ABSORPTION FROM THE ALIMENTARY CANAL

Title (en)

NUTRITIONAL AND/OR PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION FOR USE IN PROPHYLAXIS AND TREATMENT OF DISTURBANCES IN MICROELEMENTS ABSORPTION FROM THE ALIMENTARY CANAL

Title (de)

NÄHRMITTEL UND/ODER PHARMAZEUTISCHES PRÄPARAT FÜR DIE PROPHYLAXE UND BEHANDLUNG VON STÖRUNGEN DER SPURENELEMENTABSORPTION AUS DEM VERDAUUNGSTRAKT

Title (fr)

PREPARATION NUTRITIVE ET/OU PHARMACEUTIQUE DESTINÉE A ETRE UTLISÉE EN PROPHYLAXIE ET TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES DANS L' ABSORPTION DE MICRO-ELEMENTS A PARTIR DU TUBE DIGESTIF

Publication

EP 1806983 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 05799655 A

Priority

  • PL 2005000068 W
  • PL 37093704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006046880A1] The invention dissolves the problem of the pharmaceutical preparation being a factor stimulating the absorption of microelements. The essence of the invention is that the preparation contains alpha-keto- glutarate or/and glutamine or/and glutamate or/and ornithine of alpha-keto- glutarate, dipeptide of glutamine and other amino acids or/and tripeptides of glutamine and other amino acids or/and glutamate with other amino acid or/and salts of alpha-keto-glutarate or/and glutamine or/and glutamate or/and ornithine of alpha-keto-glutarate, dipepetides of glutamine or glutamate with other amino acid in a dose 0.01-0.5 g/kg/day and administered orally stimulates the absorption of iron, zinc, copper, manganese, strontium, calcium, phosphorus and other microelements from the alimentary canal to the blood ensuring proper - physiological - curative level of these compounds in the blood of people and animals.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/305 (2006.01); A23K 1/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 38/05 (2006.01); A61K 38/06 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23K 20/142 (2016.05); A23K 20/105 (2016.05); A23K 20/147 (2016.05); A23L 33/175 (2016.08); A23L 33/18 (2016.08); A61K 31/06 (2013.01); A61K 31/198 (2013.01); A61K 33/24 (2013.01); A61K 33/26 (2013.01); A61K 38/05 (2013.01); A61K 38/06 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/06 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/198 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 33/24 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 33/26 + A61K 2300/00
  5. A61K 38/05 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006046880 A1 20060504; AT 394942 T 20080515; AU 2005300125 A1 20060504; AU 2005300125 B2 20110714; CA 2589324 A1 20060504; CN 101048081 A 20071003; CN 101048081 B 20110518; DE 602005006831 D1 20080626; EP 1806983 A1 20070718; EP 1806983 B1 20080514; EP 1806983 B8 20090218; HK 1109029 A1 20111216; JP 2008518002 A 20080529; JP 4960872 B2 20120627; KR 20070117534 A 20071212; PL 370937 A1 20060502; RU 2007115542 A 20081210; RU 2393720 C2 20100710; US 2009238895 A1 20090924

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141029

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-07-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-06-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-05-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005006831

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-12-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130906

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080815

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2010-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2010-07-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081115

2009-05-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-04-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080814

2009-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2009-04-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090217

2009-02-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081014

2009-02-27 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2009-02-27 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2009-01-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2009-01-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2008-12-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080914

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SGP & SONS AB

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIERZYNOWSKI, STEFAN G.

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIERZYNOWSKI, LUKASZ

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIERZYNOWSKI, KACPER

2008-12-10 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PIERZYNOWSKI, STEFAN G.

2008-12-10 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PIERZYNOWSKI, LUKASZ

2008-12-10 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PIERZYNOWSKI, KACPER

2008-11-28 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: PIERZYNOWSKI, LUKASZ;UL. ARCTOWSKIEGO 3;02784 WARSZAWA (PL) $ PIERZYNOWSKI, KACPER;UL. ARCTOWSKIEGO 3;02784 WARSZAWA (PL) $ SGP & SONS AB;LILLA VARVSGATAN 14;211 15 MALMOE (SE) $ PIERZYNOWSKI, STEFAN G.;VIMPELGATAN 21;211 14 MALMOE (SE)

2008-11-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PIERZYNOWSKI, STEFAN G.

- Free text: PIERZYNOWSKI, STEFAN G.#BANKGATAN 15B#223 52 LUND (SE) $ SGP & SONS AB#BANKGATAN 15 B#223 52 LUND (SE) $ PIERZYNOWSKI, LUKASZ#UL. ARCTOWSKIEGO 3#02784 WARSZAWA (PL) $ PIERZYNOWSKI, KACPER#UL. ARCTOWSKIEGO 3#02784 WARSZAWA (PL) -TRANSFER TO- PIERZYNOWSKI, STEFAN G.#BANKGATAN 15B#223 52 LUND (SE) $ PIERZYNOWSKI, LUKASZ#UL. ARCTOWSKIEGO 3#02784 WARSZAWA (PL) $ PIERZYNOWSKI, KACPER#UL. ARCTOWSKIEGO 3#02784 WARSZAWA (PL) $ SGP & SONS AB#LILLA VARVSGATAN 14#211 15 MALMOE (SE)

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2008-11-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2008-11-28 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2008-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080825

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2008-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2008-09-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080514

2008-09-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005006831 P 20080626

2008-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2008-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-02-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR