Global Patent Index - EP 1808556 A3

EP 1808556 A3 2009-02-25 - Tent with awning

Title (en)

Tent with awning

Title (de)

Zelt mit einem Vordachteil

Title (fr)

Tente dotée d'une partie d'auvent

Publication

EP 1808556 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07000087 A

Priority

DE 102006001785 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1808556A2] The tent has a projecting roof part, and a lattice structure (10) that is pulled apart from a non-usage position into a usage position. The structure is pushed together from the usage position into the non-usage position. A mechanism automatically brings the roof part from the non-usage position into the usage position using movement of a bar (1) of the structure, when the structure is pulled apart. The mechanism automatically brings the roof part from the usage position into the non-usage position using the movement of the bar of the structure, when the structure is pushed together.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1808556 A2 20070718; EP 1808556 A3 20090225; DE 102006001785 A1 20070719; DE 102006001785 B4 20140403; US 2007186967 A1 20070816

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-02-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZINGERLEMETAL S.P.A.

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU