Global Patent Index - EP 1809444 B1

EP 1809444 B1 2010-02-24 - DEVICE FOR LOCKING A BATTERY PACK IN A GUIDE IN AN ELECTRIC TOOL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR LOCKING A BATTERY PACK IN A GUIDE IN AN ELECTRIC TOOL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERRIEGELN EINES BATTERIEPACKS IN EINER FÜHRUNG EINES ELEKTROWERKZEUGS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF SERVANT A VERROUILLER UN BLOC-BATTERIE DANS UNE COULISSE D'UN OUTIL ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1809444 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 05772047 A

Priority

  • EP 2005053830 W
  • DE 102004049085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101039777A] The invention relates to a device for locking a battery pack (6) in a guide (10) in an electric tool (4), whereby the battery pack (6), on insertion into the guide (10), may first be displaced into a front locking position, in which the same is locked to the electric tool (4), with no electrical contact between the electric tool (4) and the battery pack (6) and then further displaced into a rear locking position, in which the same is locked to the electric tool (4) and an electrical contact between the electric tool (4) and the battery pack (6) is generated and the battery pack may be manually unlocked for removal and may be moved from the rear locking position out of the guide (10) via the front locking position. The electric tool (4) comprises a bolt (20), which remains locked to the battery pack (6) on a movement of the battery pack (6) between both locking positions and which may be displaced together with the battery pack (6) in relation to the electric tool (4).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 102004049085 A1 20060413; CN 100548588 C 20091014; CN 101039777 A 20070919; DE 502005009104 D1 20100408; EP 1809444 A1 20070725; EP 1809444 B1 20100224; US 2008150481 A1 20080626; US 7455544 B2 20081125; WO 2006040204 A1 20060420

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130804

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005009104

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130804

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101125

2010-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005009104 P 20100408

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-02-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080429

2008-01-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070508

2007-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB