Global Patent Index - EP 1811585 A8

EP 1811585 A8 2007-10-10 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT

Title (en)

ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT

Title (de)

ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZELEMENT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT ELECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE

Publication

EP 1811585 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 05782401 A

Priority

  • JP 2005016749 W
  • JP 2004327019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2006110623A1] An organic electro-luminescent device exhibiting an excellent heat resistance, a long serving life and a great efficiency of light emission and producing a light emission ranging from a blue light to a red light. The organic electroluminescent device comprising one or more thin-film layers which contain at least a light emitting layer and are interposed between a cathode and an anode, wherein the light emitting layer contains an amine compound represented by any of the following general formula (A) and a fluorene-based compound represented by any of the following general formula (B).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/06 (2013.01); C09B 3/14 (2013.01); C09B 6/00 (2013.01); C09B 23/12 (2013.01); C09B 23/148 (2013.01); C09B 57/00 (2013.01); C09B 57/001 (2013.01); C09B 57/008 (2013.01); H01L 51/0058 (2013.01); H05B 33/14 (2013.01); C09K 2211/1011 (2013.01); C09K 2211/1014 (2013.01); C09K 2211/1029 (2013.01); C09K 2211/1088 (2013.01); H01L 51/006 (2013.01); H01L 51/0071 (2013.01); H01L 51/0073 (2013.01); H01L 51/0081 (2013.01); H01L 51/0085 (2013.01); H01L 51/5012 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2006110623 A1 20060525; CN 101057348 A 20071017; EP 1811585 A1 20070725; EP 1811585 A8 20071010; JP 2006140235 A 20060601; KR 20070084110 A 20070824; TW 200628585 A 20060816; WO 2006051649 A1 20060518

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081106

2008-02-13 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FUNAHASHI, MASAKAZU

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ITO, MITSUNORI

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAWAMURA, HISAYUKI

2007-10-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FUNAHASHI, MASAKAZU

2007-10-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ITO, MITSUNORI

2007-10-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAWAMURA, HISAYUKI

2007-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR