Global Patent Index - EP 1813114 A4

EP 1813114 A4 20071107 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREDECODING HYBRID BITSTREAM

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREDECODING HYBRID BITSTREAM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORDECODIERUNG EINES HYBRIDEN BITSTROMS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRECODAGE DE TRAINS DE BITS HYBRIDE

Publication

EP 1813114 A4 20071107 (EN)

Application

EP 05808648 A 20050913

Priority

  • KR 2005003030 W 20050913
  • US 61902304 P 20041018
  • KR 20050006803 A 20050125

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006043753A1] A method and apparatus for efficiently predecoding a hybrid bitstream generated by a plurality of coding schemes are provided. The method includes obtaining a first bit-rate for a boundary between the lower layer bitstream and the upper layer bitstream and a second bit-rate for a boundary between motion information and texture information of the upper layer bitstream from the input hybrid bitstream, determining the target bit-rate according to variable network circumstances, and when the target bit-rate is between the first and second bit-rates, skipping the motion information of the upper layer bitstream and truncating all bits of the texture information of the upper layer bitstream from the tail, except bits corresponding to the difference between the target bit-rate and the first bit-rate.

IPC 8 full level

H04N 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

H04N 19/132 (2014.11); H04N 19/162 (2014.11); H04N 19/164 (2014.11); H04N 19/187 (2014.11); H04N 19/36 (2014.11); H04N 19/517 (2014.11); H04N 19/61 (2014.11); H04N 19/615 (2014.11); H04N 19/63 (2014.11); H04N 19/647 (2014.11); H04N 19/85 (2014.11); H04N 19/115 (2014.11); H04N 19/13 (2014.11); H04N 19/146 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 0139503 A1 20010531 - KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]
  • [X] TSAI S S ET AL: "Motion information scalability for MC-EZBC", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 19, no. 7, August 2004 (2004-08-01), pages 675 - 684, XP004524459, ISSN: 0923-5965
  • [X] BARBARIEN J ET AL: "Scalable motion vector coding", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, vol. 40, no. 15, 22 July 2004 (2004-07-22), pages 932 - 934, XP006022395, ISSN: 0013-5194
  • [PA] BARBARIEN J ET AL: "Scalable motion vector coding", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2004. ICIP '04. 2004 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SINGAPORE 24-27 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, 24 October 2004 (2004-10-24), pages 1321 - 1324, XP010785446, ISBN: 0-7803-8554-3
  • [PA] RUIQIN XIONG ET AL: "Layered motion estimation and coding for fully scalable 3d wavelet video coding", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2004. ICIP '04. 2004 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SINGAPORE 24-27 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, 24 October 2004 (2004-10-24), pages 2271 - 2274, XP010786238, ISBN: 0-7803-8554-3
  • See also references of WO 2006043753A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2006043753 A1 20060427; EP 1813114 A1 20070801; EP 1813114 A4 20071107

DOCDB simple family (application)

KR 2005003030 W 20050913; EP 05808648 A 20050913