Global Patent Index - EP 1813389 A3

EP 1813389 A3 2009-02-18 - Precision vice for a machine tool

Title (en)

Precision vice for a machine tool

Title (de)

Präzisionsschraubstock für eine Werkzeugmaschine

Title (fr)

Etau de précision pour machine-outil

Publication

EP 1813389 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07101143 A

Priority

AT 1182006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1813389A2] The device has a threaded casing for fine adjustment of clamping centre of the vice and supported around a common axis (A) in a precision carriage (9) in a rotatable manner. The casing has a threaded hole (11), and clamping units (20, 21, 22) are arranged in the carriage and are provided for coupling and decoupling the casing with the carriage in a fixed manner. The clamping units and the casing are formed in such a manner that the casing takes up a predetermined position in direction along the axis relative to the carriage through a fixed coupling.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/103 (2013.01); B25B 1/2484 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1813389 A2 20070801; EP 1813389 A3 20090218; EP 1813389 B1 20100414; AT 464157 T 20100415; DE 502007003434 D1 20100527

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110117

2010-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KAMINSKI HARMANN PATENTANWAELTE EST.

2010-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003434 P 20100527

2010-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090727

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU