Global Patent Index - EP 1814134 A3

EP 1814134 A3 2009-02-25 - Power supply apparatus and high frequency circuit system

Title (en)

Power supply apparatus and high frequency circuit system

Title (de)

Netzteilgerät und Hochfrequenzschaltungssystem

Title (fr)

Appareil d'alimentation électrique et système de circuit haute fréquence

Publication

EP 1814134 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07001734 A

Priority

JP 2006022851 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1814134A2] A power supply apparatus (60) for supplying predetermined supply voltages respectively to an anode electrode (40), a cathode electrode (11), a collector electrode (30), and a helix (20) of an electron tube. The power supply apparatus comprises an anode switch (65) for turning on/off the anode voltage output, and an anode switch control circuit (66) for controlling the on/off operation of the anode switch such that a pulsed anode voltage is repeatedly applied to the anode electrode a plurality of times at a predetermined period when operation of a helix power supply (61) and a collector power supply (62) is stopped.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 2005077831 A1 20050414 - TSUCHIDA HIROSHI [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1814134 A2 20070801; EP 1814134 A3 20090225; EP 1814134 B1 20100901; DE 602007008775 D1 20101014; JP 2007207496 A 20070816; JP 4796855 B2 20111019; US 2007176689 A1 20070802; US 7489084 B2 20090210

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-07-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150611 AND 20150617

2015-06-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NEC NETWORK AND SENSOR SYSTEMS, LTD., FUCHU-SH, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NETCOMSEC CO., LTD., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 602007008775

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007008775

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

2011-10-06 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007008775

- Effective date: 20110606

2011-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110606

2010-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007008775 P 20101014

2010-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2010-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU