Global Patent Index - EP 1814379 A4

EP 1814379 A4 2009-02-25 - EUCALYPTUS UROPHYLLA TRANSFORMATION AND SELECTION

Title (en)

EUCALYPTUS UROPHYLLA TRANSFORMATION AND SELECTION

Title (de)

EUCALYPTUS-UROPHYLLA-TRANSFORMATION UND -SELEKTION

Title (fr)

TRANSFORMATION ET SELECTION D'EUCALYPTUS UROPHYLLA

Publication

EP 1814379 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05851291 A

Priority

  • US 2005039520 W
  • US 98174204 A
  • US 15834205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006052554A2] The present invention relates to a method for transforming and selecting plant explants. The transformation method includes pre-culturing the explants in the presence of an Agrobacterium inducer and exposing the transformed explants to a shoot regeneration media that accelerates shoot development. Plants generated from this transformation method are provided. In particular, methods for obtaining transgenic E. grandis x E. urophylla cells and therefrom regenerating stably transformed E. grandis x E. urophylla trees are provided. The invention also provides media, methods, and plasmids for selecting and regenerating plants.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 2004108903 A2 20041216 - ARBORGEN LLC [US], et al
  • [A] WO 0015813 A1 20000323 - GENESIS RES & DEV CORP LTD [NZ], et al
  • [A] EP 1050209 A2 20001108 - OJI PAPER CO [JP]
  • [A] CHEN ZENN-ZONG ET AL: "Callus culture of Eucalyptus grandis x urophylla and preliminary studies on organogenesis and Agrobacterium-mediated transformation", TAIWAN JOURNAL OF FOREST SCIENCE, vol. 11, no. 1, 1996, pages 43 - 52, XP002509323, ISSN: 1026-4469
  • [A] MACHADO LUCIANA DE OLIVEIRA R ET AL: "Agrobacterium strain specificity and shooty tumour formation in eucalypt (Eucalyptus grandis x E. urophylla)", PLANT CELL REPORTS, vol. 16, no. 5, 1997, pages 299 - 303, XP008100088, ISSN: 0721-7714

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006052554 A2 20060518; WO 2006052554 A3 20080904; AR 051478 A1 20070117; AU 2005305071 A1 20060518; EP 1814379 A2 20070808; EP 1814379 A4 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-10 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090427

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090123

2009-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/82 20060101AFI20090113BHEP

2008-10-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/84 20060101AFI20080919BHEP

2008-10-15 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080904

2008-02-13 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070523

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU