Global Patent Index - EP 1814978 A2

EP 1814978 A2 20070808 - MEANS FOR IMPROVING FERMENTING CAPACITIES OF ACTIVE YEASTS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

MEANS FOR IMPROVING FERMENTING CAPACITIES OF ACTIVE YEASTS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

MITTEL ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FERMENTIERUNGSMÖGLICHKEITEN AKTIVER HEFEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

MOYENS POUR AMELIORER LES CAPACITES FERMENTAIRES DE LEVURES ACTIVES ET LEURS APPLICATIONS

Publication

EP 1814978 A2 20070808 (FR)

Application

EP 05818158 A 20051121

Priority

  • FR 2005002887 W 20051121
  • FR 0412309 A 20041119

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006053994A2] The invention concerns dry active yeasts useful for rehydration and/or alcoholic fermentation, or rehydrated active yeasts useful for fermentation, or yeasts useful for fermentation, having a sterol content exhibiting at least two conjugated double bonds at the B cycle of at least 900 µg/g of dry weight. The invention is useful for producing fermented alcoholic beverages.

IPC 8 full level

C12N 1/16 (2006.01); C12C 11/00 (2006.01); C12G 1/022 (2006.01); C12G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C12N 1/04 (2013.01); C12N 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • VIRGINIE SOUBEYRAND ET AL: "Formation of Micella Containing Solubilized Sterols during Rehydration of Active Dry Yeasts Improves Their Fermenting Capacity", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, vol. 53, no. 20, 1 October 2005 (2005-10-01), pages 8025 - 8032, XP055073377, ISSN: 0021-8561, DOI: 10.1021/jf050907m
  • ANGELES POZO-BAYON M ET AL: "Scientific evidences beyond the application of inactive dry yeast preparations in winemaking", FOOD RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, BARKING, GB, vol. 42, no. 7, 1 August 2009 (2009-08-01), pages 754 - 761, XP026131984, ISSN: 0963-9969, [retrieved on 20090401], DOI: 10.1016/J.FOODRES.2009.03.004
  • A. SERRA ET AL: "Characterization of the metabolic shift of Saccharomyces bayanus var. uvarum by continuous aerobic culture", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 62, no. 5-6, 1 October 2003 (2003-10-01), pages 564 - 568, XP055073461, ISSN: 0175-7598, DOI: 10.1007/s00253-003-1288-5

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

FR 2878253 A1 20060526; FR 2878253 B1 20130802; AU 2005305711 A1 20060526; EP 1814978 A2 20070808; US 2008118600 A1 20080522; WO 2006053994 A2 20060526; WO 2006053994 A3 20061228

DOCDB simple family (application)

FR 0412309 A 20041119; AU 2005305711 A 20051121; EP 05818158 A 20051121; FR 2005002887 W 20051121; US 79101705 A 20051121