EP 1815332 A4 20090715 - PROCESS CHECKPOINTING AND MIGRATION IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS
Title (en)
PROCESS CHECKPOINTING AND MIGRATION IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS
Title (de)
PROZESS-CHECKPOINTING UND MIGRATION IN DATENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEMEN
Title (fr)
MIGRATION ET VERIFICATION DE PROCEDE DANS DES SYSTEMES INFORMATIQUES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2005013126 W 20050418
- US 60817304 P 20040907
- US 60817704 P 20040907
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2006028520A1] Methods and systems are provided for migrating tasks (406, 410, 412, 414) between computing devices in a computing system, such as a communications computing systems. For example, according to the invention, one computing device can take over providing services previously provided by another computing device without disrupting such services Moreover, according to various embodiments of the present invention, migration can be performed efficiently (404, 406) by avoiding treatment of all tasks alike. More particularly, tasks to be migrated may be separated into groups including critical tasks, restartable tasks, and migratable tasks, each of which is handled in a unique manner according to the invention.
IPC 8 full level
G06F 9/46 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G06F 9/4856 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] EP 1215575 A2 20020619 - DOCOMO COMM LAB USA INC [US]
- [A] US 6161193 A 20001212 - GARG SACHIN [US], et al
- [AY] CONG DU ET AL: "A runtime system for autonomic rescheduling of MPI programs", PARALLEL PROCESSING, 2004. ICPP 2004. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, QC, CANADA 15-18 AUG. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, 15 August 2004 (2004-08-15), pages 4 - 11, XP010718573, ISBN: 978-0-7695-2197-8
- [A] ZHONG H ET AL: "CRAK: LINUX CHECKPOINT/RESTART AS A KERNEL MODULE", TECHNICAL REPORT CUCS, XX, XX, no. 14-01, 1 November 2001 (2001-11-01), pages 1 - 18, XP008043705
- [A] LEE, KEVIN C.: "MIGSOCK II - Migratable TCP Socket in Linux", THESIS, 12 May 2004 (2004-05-12), Carnegie Mellon University, Information Networking Institute, pages I-VII,1 - 103, XP002529447, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.ece.cmu.edu/~kclee/kclee-thesis.pdf> [retrieved on 20090526]
- See references of WO 2006028521A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2006028520 A1 20060316; EP 1815332 A1 20070808; EP 1815332 A4 20090715; EP 1815333 A1 20070808; EP 1815333 A4 20100825; WO 2006028521 A1 20060316
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2005013122 W 20050418; EP 05737750 A 20050418; EP 05738099 A 20050418; US 2005013126 W 20050418