Global Patent Index - EP 1816105 A8

EP 1816105 A8 2007-10-10 - PROCESS AND REAGENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF INDUSTRIAL WASTEWATER

Title (en)

PROCESS AND REAGENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF INDUSTRIAL WASTEWATER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND REAGENS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INDUSTRIELLEM ABWASSER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET REACTIF DE TRAITEMENT D'EAUX RESIDUELLES INDUSTRIELLES

Publication

EP 1816105 A8 (FR)

Application

EP 04791379 A

Priority

ES 2004000460 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006045857A1] The invention relates to a process and reagent for the treatment of industrial wastewater. The invention is characterised in that a partially-thermally-regenerable coagulation/adsorption reagent is added to the coagulation reactor, such that water which is at least 99 % free of organic matter can be obtained using a process in which the organic matter is coagulated/adsorbed directly in a single step without the need for lamellar or static decanters. According to the invention, the sludge is separated using ultrafiltration membrane processes at a flow rate of between 90 and 95 % in relation to the inflow and without the need for added polyelectrolytes. In this way, the water is then optimal for reuse in industrial processes. The invention also enables the direct recycling of sludge from part of the rejects, with the resulting reduction in infrastructure such as pipes, pumps, civil engineering and valve systems, as well as a reduction in reactor size, energy consumption, etc. The inventive method is suitable for industrial water for oil removal, paint kiosks, reactor cleaning, etc., i.e. water that is loaded with organic compounds, such as detergents, pigments, dyes, softeners, solvents, hydrocarbons, alcohols, etc.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/24 (2006.01); C02F 1/28 (2006.01); C02F 1/52 (2006.01); C02F 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 9/00 (2013.01); C02F 1/281 (2013.01); C02F 1/283 (2013.01); C02F 1/444 (2013.01); C02F 1/5236 (2013.01); C02F 1/56 (2013.01); C02F 11/121 (2013.01); C02F 11/14 (2013.01); C02F 2103/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1816105 A1 20070808; EP 1816105 A8 20071010; SE 0601319 A 20060821; WO 2006045857 A1 20060504

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101008

2009-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090518

2008-01-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOTWIST, S.L.

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MELERO TALAVERA, SERGI

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIMON POLO, ALBERT

2007-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATHIAS BRUNS, MARCUS

2007-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070518

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR