Global Patent Index - EP 1818451 B1

EP 1818451 B1 2009-02-25 - Packaging paper and paper sack made therefrom as well as method of producing the packaging paper.

Title (en)

Packaging paper and paper sack made therefrom as well as method of producing the packaging paper.

Title (de)

Packpapier und daraus hergestellter Papiersack sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung des Packpapiers

Title (fr)

Papier d'emballage et sac en papier préparé à base de ce papier et procédé de fabrication de ce papier d'emballage

Publication

EP 1818451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06002540 A

Priority

EP 06002540 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1818451A1] Wrapping paper comprises discrete islands surrounded by a network structure, where the islands have a lower fiber content and thus a lower density than the network structure. Independent claims are also included for: (1) paper bag for transporting bulk goods, with walls made of wrapping paper as above; (2) producing wrapping paper by dewatering pulp on a sheet former wire comprising a permeable support with a pattern of discrete islands of covering material surrounded by a network structure, where the islands have a lower permeability than the network structure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/02 (2013.01); B65D 33/01 (2013.01); D21F 11/006 (2013.01); D21H 27/10 (2013.01); B65D 2205/00 (2013.01); D21H 27/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1818451 A1 20070815; EP 1818451 B1 20090225; AT 423868 T 20090315; DE 502006002938 D1 20090409; ES 2320254 T3 20090520

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150209

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150209

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150208

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 423868 T

- Effective date: 20150208

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006002938

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140103

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-06-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-05-20 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2320254 T3

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002938 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR SE

2008-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONDI FRANTSCHACH GMBH

2008-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR SE

2007-08-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061213

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU