Global Patent Index - EP 1818962 A3

EP 1818962 A3 2009-02-25 - Switch

Title (en)

Switch

Title (de)

Schalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur

Publication

EP 1818962 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 07002577 A

Priority

DE 102006006409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1818962A2] The switch (22) has a lever drive (10) with an operating lever (12), a contact lever (16) and an intermediate lever (14) connected with the operating lever in a movable manner. The contact lever closes an electrical contact in an ON-position and opens the electrical contact in an OFF-position. The operating lever and the intermediate lever take an elongated or over-extended position in a position of the lever drive.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 73/40 (2006.01); H01H 83/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 73/40 (2013.01); H01H 23/18 (2013.01); H01H 83/12 (2013.01); H01H 23/20 (2013.01); H01H 2300/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1818962 A2 20070815; EP 1818962 A3 20090225; DE 102006006409 A1 20070816

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-03-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU