Global Patent Index - EP 1821277 A3

EP 1821277 A3 2010-02-17 - Method for driving plasma display panel with attenuation estimation and compensation and corresponding apparatus

Title (en)

Method for driving plasma display panel with attenuation estimation and compensation and corresponding apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Plasmaanzeigetafel mit Dämpfungsschätzung und -korrektur sowie entsprechende Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un panneau d'affichage à plasma avec estimation et compensation de l'atténuation, et appareil correspondant

Publication

EP 1821277 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07102607 A

Priority

  • EP 06290293 A
  • EP 07102607 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1821277A2] The picture quality on a plasma display panel shall be improved when the contrast and/or the brightness are reduced. This is achieved by estimating the reduction of the dynamic occurring in the front-end (2) of the data processing of the plasma display device and by compensating it in the back-end (3). Specifically, the gain and/or offset of the video input data are adjusted (5) and the power level of the adjusted video data is measured (10). The resulting power level information is updated (13) on the basis of an attenuation information (12). The updated power level is used for the power management (9) and the level of the video data being reduced (5) in the front-end (2) is increased (14) on the basis of the attenuation information. Thus, the dynamic of the video and, as a result, the picture quality are improved.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/28 (2006.01); G09G 3/288 (2006.01); G09G 3/294 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2944 (2013.01); G09G 3/2803 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0271 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0606 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0626 (2013.01); G09G 2320/066 (2013.01); G09G 2330/045 (2013.01); G09G 2360/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1821277 A2 20070822; EP 1821277 A3 20100217

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160901

2010-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100921

2010-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100812

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU