Global Patent Index - EP 1826351 A3

EP 1826351 A3 2009-02-18 - Sliding or raising and sliding door or window

Title (en)

Sliding or raising and sliding door or window

Title (de)

Schiebe- oder Hebeschiebetür oder -fenster

Title (fr)

Porte ou fenêtre coulissante ou relevable et coulissante

Publication

EP 1826351 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 06022459 A

Priority

DE 202006003117 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1826351A2] The sliding or sliding and lifting door (10) or window has at least one panel (14) that is movably guided in an opening frame (12) and a brake unit (22) for braking the panel, which is connected to the brake unit via a drive arrangement (24). Either the drive arrangement or the brake unit is rigidly connected to the frame.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 5/00 (2006.01); E05F 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/14 (2013.01); E05F 5/003 (2013.01); E05D 15/565 (2013.01); E05F 1/046 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/21 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/254 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/266 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006003117 U1 20060427; AT 472661 T 20100715; DE 502006007321 D1 20100812; EP 1826351 A2 20070829; EP 1826351 A3 20090218; EP 1826351 B1 20100630

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006007321

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006007321 P 20100812

2010-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2010-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2009-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090825

2009-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090619

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU