Global Patent Index - EP 1827494 A4

EP 1827494 A4 2010-02-17 - COMBINATION GROWTH THERAPY AND CELL THERAPY FOR TREATMENT OF ACUTE AND CHRONIC DISEASES OF THE ORGANS

Title (en)

COMBINATION GROWTH THERAPY AND CELL THERAPY FOR TREATMENT OF ACUTE AND CHRONIC DISEASES OF THE ORGANS

Title (de)

KOMBINATIONSWACHSTUMSTHERAPIE UND ZELLTHERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AKUTEN UND CHRONISCHEN ORGANERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMBINAISON DE THERAPIE AU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE ET DE THERAPIE CELLULAIRE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES AIGUES ET CHRONIQUES DES ORGANES

Publication

EP 1827494 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 05823219 A

Priority

  • US 2005041740 W
  • US 99159204 A
  • US 11485105 A
  • US 17924505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006055743A2] Acute and chronic diseases of the organs are treated using a rational, multi-tier approach. A patient is pretreated with growth factor proteins or gene therapy, followed by the administration of adult stem cells or other cell therapy. The patient can be a fetus treated in utero or removed from the womb. The progress of treatment is monitored by ultrasound, MRI, CAT scan, cardiac echo, EEG, EKG, EMG or blood tests, with growth factor treatment and/or stem cell administration adjusted according to the results of the monitoring or clinical status of the patient. Organ disease is also treated by a method that comprises administration of a therapeutically effective amount of a growth factor protein by oral inhalation or intranasal therapy. Diseases affecting organs such as the brain, spinal cord, pancreas, liver, kidney, muscle, heart and upper and lower gastrointestinal tracts are treated using the present method. A device for treatment is disclosed. CPK is utilized to assess the treatment of muscle disease.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/28 (2013.01); A61K 35/545 (2013.01); A61K 38/1825 (2013.01); A61K 38/1866 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 48/005 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10043 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 35/28 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 38/1866 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 38/1825 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 35/545 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006055743 A2 20060526; WO 2006055743 A3 20080717; EP 1827494 A2 20070905; EP 1827494 A4 20100217

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110621

2010-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100512

2010-02-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100120

2008-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 38/18 20060101AFI20080801BHEP

2008-08-27 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080717

2008-02-27 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU