Global Patent Index - EP 1829585 A8

EP 1829585 A8 2007-10-24 - SADDLE FOR EXCERCISE APPARATUS USING THE SAME

Title (en)

SADDLE FOR EXCERCISE APPARATUS USING THE SAME

Title (de)

SATTEL FÜR DIESEN VERWENDENDES ÜBUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

SELLE POUR UN APPAREIL D'EXERCICE ET APPAREIL D'EXERCICE L'UTILISANT

Publication

EP 1829585 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 04819884 A

Priority

  • JP 2004017926 W
  • JP 2003407972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007123401A1] A saddle for an exercise equipment for allowing a user to perform an exercise in a sitting posture is provided, which has the capability of suppressing variations in sitting posture to achieve stable exercise effects. The exercise equipment has a base, the saddle for supporting the user's buttocks, and a coupling mechanism configured to movably couple the saddle to the base such that a load acted on a leg by the user's own weight varies according to a relative positional displacement between a foot position and a position of center of gravity of the user, and also configured to limit a movable direction of the saddle such that a direction of the relative positional displacement between the foot position and the position of center of gravity is limited to a direction of flexion and extension of knee joint. The saddle has a pair of curved recesses at its outer periphery, which are configured such that parts of the femoral regions of the user fit the recesses.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/00 (2006.01); A63B 23/04 (2006.01); A63B 22/14 (2006.01); A63B 22/16 (2006.01); A63B 23/02 (2006.01); A63B 26/00 (2006.01); A63B 22/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/16 (2013.01); A63B 26/003 (2013.01); A63B 23/0227 (2013.01); A63B 2208/0233 (2013.01); A63B 2225/093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2007123401 A1 20070531; US 8162810 B2 20120424; CN 100415324 C 20080903; CN 1890002 A 20070103; EP 1829585 A1 20070905; EP 1829585 A4 20090114; EP 1829585 A8 20071024; EP 2345460 A1 20110720; JP 2005168514 A 20050630; JP 4496768 B2 20100707; KR 100764064 B1 20071009; KR 20060121241 A 20061128; TW 200520820 A 20050701; TW I244934 B 20051211; WO 2005053799 A1 20050616

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1110251

2012-01-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110802

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-02-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO., LTD.

2009-01-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-07-11 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1110251

2007-10-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OZAWA, TAKAHISAC/O MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.

2007-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHINOMIYA, YOUICHIC/O MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, L

2007-10-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OCHI, KAZUHIROC/O MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.

2007-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060609

2007-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR