Global Patent Index - EP 1830252 A3

EP 1830252 A3 2009-02-04 - Specialised processing block for programmable logic device

Title (en)

Specialised processing block for programmable logic device

Title (de)

Spezieller Verarbeitungsblock für eine programmierbare logische Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Bloc de traitement spécialisé pour dispositif logique programmable

Publication

EP 1830252 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07002429 A

Priority

  • US 77198906 P
  • US 44732906 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1830252A2] A specialized processing block for a programmable logic device includes circuitry for performing multiplications and sums thereof, as well as circuitry for rounding the result. The rounding circuitry can selectably perform round-to-nearest and round-to-nearest-even operations. In addition, the bit position at which rounding occurs is preferably selectable. The specialized processing block preferably also includes saturation circuitry to prevent overflows and underflows, and the bit position at which saturation occurs also preferably is selectable. The selectability of both the rounding and saturation positions provides control of the output data word width. The rounding and saturation circuitry may be selectably located in different positions based on timing needs. Similarly, rounding may be speeded up using a look-ahead mode in which both rounded and unrounded results are computed in parallel, with the rounding logic selecting between those results.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/544 (2006.01); G06F 7/499 (2006.01); H03K 19/173 (2006.01); H03K 19/177 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/49963 (2013.01); G06F 7/49921 (2013.01); G06F 7/49947 (2013.01); G06F 7/5443 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1830252 A2 20070905; EP 1830252 A3 20090204; CN 101042583 A 20070926; CN 101042583 B 20110302; JP 2007215192 A 20070823; JP 5069476 B2 20121107; US 2007185951 A1 20070809; US 8266198 B2 20120911

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-19 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121109

2010-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100727

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090803

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU