Global Patent Index - EP 1830478 A8

EP 1830478 A8 2007-10-24 - Spread spectrum communication device and spread spectrum communication method

Title (en)

Spread spectrum communication device and spread spectrum communication method

Title (de)

Speizspektrumkommunikationsgerät und Spreizspektrumkommunikationsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de communication à spectre étalé

Publication

EP 1830478 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 07011904 A

Priority

  • EP 06008655 A
  • EP 05015438 A
  • EP 04013246 A
  • EP 01128185 A
  • EP 99907868 A
  • JP 8003198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6885648B2] In a compressed mode, a spread spectrum communication device interleaves bit units across multiple frames using an interleaver, reduces the spreading factor using a framing/spreading unit, outputs the compressed mode frames at a predetermined compressed mode frame timing, and increases the average transmission power in the compressed mode at a radio frequency transmitter. Furthermore, a handover between different frequencies is carried out by establishing synchronization to another frequency carrier, based on a first search code and a second search code which have been detected, and moreover, a handover between different communication systems is carried out by establishing synchronization to a GSM, based on an FCCH and a SCH which have been detected.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/04 (2009.01); H03M 13/27 (2006.01); H04B 1/707 (2006.01); H04B 1/7073 (2011.01); H04B 1/7083 (2011.01); H04B 1/7087 (2011.01); H04B 7/005 (2006.01); H04B 7/216 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04J 13/00 (2011.01); H04J 13/16 (2011.01); H04L 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 7/00 (2006.01); H04W 36/00 (2009.01); H04W 36/30 (2009.01); H04W 36/36 (2009.01); H04W 52/08 (2009.01); H04W 52/26 (2009.01); H04W 52/28 (2009.01); H04W 52/36 (2009.01); H04W 52/44 (2009.01); H04W 52/48 (2009.01); H04W 52/56 (2009.01); H04W 52/60 (2009.01); H04W 76/02 (2009.01); H04B 1/7075 (2011.01); H04W 36/14 (2009.01); H04W 52/00 (2009.01); H04W 56/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/7087 (2013.01); G08C 15/00 (2013.01); H04B 1/707 (2013.01); H04B 1/70735 (2013.01); H04B 7/2628 (2013.01); H04J 13/00 (2013.01); H04L 1/0001 (2013.01); H04L 1/0003 (2013.01); H04L 1/0009 (2013.01); H04L 1/0025 (2013.01); H04L 1/0042 (2013.01); H04L 1/0047 (2013.01); H04L 1/0056 (2013.01); H04L 1/0071 (2013.01); H04L 1/0083 (2013.01); H04W 52/08 (2013.01); H04W 52/267 (2013.01); H04W 52/28 (2013.01); H04W 52/287 (2013.01); H04W 52/288 (2013.01); H04W 52/36 (2013.01); H04W 52/362 (2013.01); H04W 52/367 (2013.01); H04W 52/48 (2013.01); H04W 52/56 (2013.01); H04W 52/60 (2013.01); H04B 1/7075 (2013.01); H04B 1/7083 (2013.01); H04B 7/2668 (2013.01); H04B 2201/70703 (2013.01); H04L 1/0026 (2013.01); H04L 1/004 (2013.01); H04W 36/0088 (2013.01); H04W 36/30 (2013.01); H04W 52/44 (2013.01); H04W 56/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 2002051438 A1 20020502; US 6885648 B2 20050426; AT 354887 T 20070315; AT 369664 T 20070815; AT 369665 T 20070815; AU 2746299 A 19991018; CA 2325421 A1 19990930; CA 2459322 A1 19990930; CA 2459322 C 20050419; CA 2459325 A1 19990930; CA 2459325 C 20050503; CN 100474804 C 20090401; CN 100492930 C 20090527; CN 100512033 C 20090708; CN 101013909 A 20070808; CN 101013909 B 20110907; CN 101013910 A 20070808; CN 101013910 B 20110907; CN 101043258 A 20070926; CN 101043258 B 20120208; CN 101232300 A 20080730; CN 101232301 A 20080730; CN 101282129 A 20081008; CN 101282130 A 20081008; CN 101282131 A 20081008; CN 101282132 A 20081008; CN 101282132 B 20120321; CN 101282133 A 20081008; CN 101282134 A 20081008; CN 101282135 A 20081008; CN 101282136 A 20081008; CN 101282136 B 20120620; CN 101282137 A 20081008; CN 101282138 A 20081008; CN 101282147 A 20081008; CN 101282148 A 20081008; CN 101335548 A 20081231; CN 101369832 A 20090218; CN 1303550 A 20010711; CN 1503464 A 20040609; CN 1503465 A 20040609; CN 1878046 A 20061213; CN 1878046 B 20111214; DE 69921200 D1 20041118; DE 69921200 T2 20060309; DE 69921862 D1 20041216; DE 69921862 T2 20051201; DE 69927421 D1 20060202; DE 69927421 T2 20060622; DE 69935267 D1 20070405; DE 69935267 T2 20071031; DE 69936805 D1 20070920; DE 69936805 T2 20080430; DE 69936806 D1 20070920; DE 69936806 T2 20080430; DE 69939134 D1 20080828; DE 69939756 D1 20081127; DE 69939960 D1 20090102; DE 69940085 D1 20090122; DE 69940709 D1 20090520; DE 69940965 D1 20090716; DE 69941638 D1 20091231; DE 69941738 D1 20100107; DE 69941739 D1 20100107; DE 69941740 D1 20100107; DE 69941803 D1 20100121; DE 69941832 D1 20100128; EP 0984581 A1 20000308; EP 0984581 A4 20030820; EP 1184992 A2 20020306; EP 1184992 A3 20030521; EP 1184992 B1 20041110; EP 1187358 A2 20020313; EP 1187358 A3 20030521; EP 1187358 B1 20041013; EP 1187358 B9 20050427; EP 1187359 A2 20020313; EP 1187359 A3 20030521; EP 1460774 A2 20040922; EP 1460774 A3 20041006; EP 1460774 B1 20050921; EP 1612960 A2 20060104; EP 1612960 A3 20060125; EP 1612960 B1 20070221; EP 1612960 B8 20100519; EP 1689089 A2 20060809; EP 1689089 A3 20060927; EP 1689089 B1 20070808; EP 1689089 B8 20100623; EP 1699141 A2 20060906; EP 1699141 A3 20060927; EP 1699141 B1 20070808; EP 1830475 A1 20070905; EP 1830475 A8 20071024; EP 1830475 B1 20081119; EP 1830476 A1 20070905; EP 1830476 A8 20071024; EP 1830476 B1 20081015; EP 1830477 A1 20070905; EP 1830477 A8 20071024; EP 1830477 B1 20080716; EP 1830478 A1 20070905; EP 1830478 A8 20071024; EP 1830478 B1 20081210; EP 1912342 A1 20080416; EP 1912342 A8 20080625; EP 1912342 B1 20090408; EP 1921759 A1 20080514; EP 1921759 B1 20091118; EP 1921760 A1 20080514; EP 1921760 B1 20110727; EP 1921761 A1 20080514; EP 1921761 B1 20111019; EP 1921762 A1 20080514; EP 1921762 B1 20091125; EP 1921763 A1 20080514; EP 1921763 B1 20110831; EP 1921764 A1 20080514; EP 1921764 B1 20091125; EP 1921765 A1 20080514; EP 1921765 B1 20090603; EP 1921766 A1 20080514; EP 1921766 B1 20091125; EP 1921767 A1 20080514; EP 1921767 B1 20091209; EP 1921768 A1 20080514; EP 1921768 B1 20111130; EP 1921769 A1 20080514; EP 1921769 B1 20091216; ES 2228734 T3 20050416; ES 2231376 T3 20050516; ES 2250942 T3 20060416; ES 2281043 T3 20070916; HK 1099970 A1 20120622; JP 2002124933 A 20020426; JP 2002190791 A 20020705; JP 2002190792 A 20020705; JP 2002330462 A 20021115; JP 2004080832 A 20040311; JP 2006157963 A 20060615; JP 2007097224 A 20070412; JP 2007135226 A 20070531; JP 2008072756 A 20080327; JP 2008072757 A 20080327; JP 2008072758 A 20080327; JP 2008072759 A 20080327; JP 2008072760 A 20080327; JP 2008072761 A 20080327; JP 2008086041 A 20080410; JP 2008099316 A 20080424; JP 2008104211 A 20080501; JP 2008104217 A 20080501; JP 2008109681 A 20080508; JP 2008109682 A 20080508; JP 2008109683 A 20080508; JP 2008228323 A 20080925; JP 2008236767 A 20081002; JP 2008245291 A 20081009; JP 3293819 B2 20020617; JP 3320710 B2 20020903; JP 3320711 B2 20020903; JP 3320746 B2 20020903; JP 3847654 B2 20061122; JP 4266033 B2 20090520; JP 4266034 B2 20090520; JP 4266037 B2 20090520; JP 4266038 B2 20090520; JP 4271714 B2 20090603; JP 4271715 B2 20090603; JP 4271716 B2 20090603; JP 4271717 B2 20090603; JP 4307960 B2 20090805; JP 4331232 B2 20090916; JP 4331246 B2 20090916; JP 4338752 B2 20091007; JP 4338753 B2 20091007; JP 4338754 B2 20091007; JP 4338755 B2 20091007; JP 4437793 B2 20100324; JP 4437813 B2 20100324; JP 4437814 B2 20100324; JP 4437830 B2 20100324; JP 4437831 B2 20100324; KR 100422606 B1 20040318; KR 100429087 B1 20040429; KR 100444643 B1 20040818; KR 100445019 B1 20040818; KR 20030076707 A 20030926; KR 20030076708 A 20030926; KR 20040039427 A 20040510; PT 1187358 E 20050131; US 2002054582 A1 20020509; US 2002090022 A1 20020711; US 2003137958 A1 20030724; US 2006203781 A1 20060914; US 2007129095 A1 20070607; US 2007140206 A1 20070621; US 2008062903 A1 20080313; US 2008062952 A1 20080313; US 2008069076 A1 20080320; US 2008069077 A1 20080320; US 2008069078 A1 20080320; US 2008069182 A1 20080320; US 2008080470 A1 20080403; US 6671267 B1 20031230; US 6680927 B2 20040120; US 7286518 B2 20071023; US 7525945 B2 20090428; US 7756098 B2 20100713; US 7990940 B2 20110802; US 7995550 B2 20110809; US 7995551 B2 20110809; US 8009654 B2 20110830; US 8014375 B2 20110906; US 8160042 B2 20120417; WO 9949609 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170301

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-08 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20110513

2009-11-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090911

2009-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940085 P 20090122

2008-12-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0984581 P

2008-12-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1699141 P

2008-12-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1612960 P

2008-12-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1460774 P

2008-12-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1187358 P

2008-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-05-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATION METHOD

2008-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YANO, YASUHIRO

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MURAI, HIDESHI

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071022

2007-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-09-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1699141 P

2007-09-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1612960 P

2007-09-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1460774 P

2007-09-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1187358 P

2007-09-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0984581 P

2007-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI